This case was last updated from Volusia County Circuit Courts on 11/15/2020 at 11:28:55 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA V. JOSHUA DALE LUCAS

Case Summary

On 05/08/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against JOSHUA DALE LUCAS. This case was filed in Volusia County Circuit Courts, Daytona Beach Justice Center located in Volusia, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are SANDRA C UPCHURCH, CRAIG and FEIGENBAUM. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************CFDB

  • Filing Date:

    05/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

SANDRA C UPCHURCH

CRAIG

FEIGENBAUM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Daytona Beach, FL 32114

Defendant

JOSHUA DALE LUCAS

Not Classified By Court

###1ST COAST BAIL BONDS & SURETY AGENCY

1635 S Ridgewood Ave Suite 105

South Daytona, FL 32119

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

CHRISTOPHER WALKER

220 S.Ridgewood Ave. St.250

Daytona Beach, FL 32114

TERRY JONES

Defendant Attorney

KIP MILLER

400 North Halifax Ave

Daytona Beach, FL 32118

 

Court Documents

MOTION

11/09/2020 : MOTION

NOTICE OF PRE-TRIAL

09/22/2020 : NOTICE OF PRE-TRIAL

STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT W/WITNESS LIST AND DEMAND FOR RECIPROCAL DISCLOSURE

08/22/2020 : STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT W/WITNESS LIST AND DEMAND FOR RECIPROCAL DISCLOSURE

NOTICE OF INTENT TO PARTICIPATE IN DISCOVERY

08/13/2020 : NOTICE OF INTENT TO PARTICIPATE IN DISCOVERY

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE & PLEA OF NOT GUILTY:

08/13/2020 : NOTICE OF APPEARANCE & PLEA OF NOT GUILTY:

NOTICE OF PRE-TRIAL

07/21/2020 : NOTICE OF PRE-TRIAL

NOTICE OF PRE-TRIAL

06/24/2020 : NOTICE OF PRE-TRIAL

SURETY APPEARANCE BOND-ORIGINAL

06/09/2020 : SURETY APPEARANCE BOND-ORIGINAL

SURETY APPEARANCE BOND-ORIGINAL

06/09/2020 : SURETY APPEARANCE BOND-ORIGINAL

SURETY APPEARANCE BOND-ORIGINAL

06/09/2020 : SURETY APPEARANCE BOND-ORIGINAL

SURETY APPEARANCE BOND-ORIGINAL

06/09/2020 : SURETY APPEARANCE BOND-ORIGINAL

SURETY APPEARANCE BOND-ORIGINAL

06/09/2020 : SURETY APPEARANCE BOND-ORIGINAL

SURETY APPEARANCE BOND-ORIGINAL

06/09/2020 : SURETY APPEARANCE BOND-ORIGINAL

SURETY APPEARANCE BOND-ORIGINAL

06/09/2020 : SURETY APPEARANCE BOND-ORIGINAL

INFORMATION FILED

05/14/2020 : INFORMATION FILED

STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT W/WITNESS LIST AND DEMAND FOR RECIPROCAL DISCLOSURE

05/18/2020 : STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT W/WITNESS LIST AND DEMAND FOR RECIPROCAL DISCLOSURE

MEMO TO FILE

05/14/2020 : MEMO TO FILE

CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

05/14/2020 : CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/14/2020
  • DocketSession Type: Pre-trial-Private-Bond; Court Officer: UPCHURCH; Location: Judge Upchurch Remote Zoom Hearing; Status: Scheduled

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • DocketSession Type: Criminal Hearing; Court Officer: UPCHURCH; Location: Justice Center Courtroom 4; Status: Scheduled

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • DocketSession Type: Pre-trial-Private-Bond; Court Officer: UPCHURCH; Location: Judge Upchurch Remote Zoom Hearing; Status: Cancelled

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) Docket Type: MOTION; Description: TO SET BOND W/PROPOSED ORDER - EMAILED TO DIV. 40

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • DocketSession Type: Pre-trial-PD-Bond; Trial Date/Time: 11/30/2020 08:30 AM; Court Officer: OTHER JUDGE; Location: Justice Center Courtroom 4; Status: Cancelled

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketSession Type: Pre-trial-Private-Bond; Court Officer: UPCHURCH; Location: Judge Upchurch Remote Zoom Hearing; Status: Continued by Defense w/WRST

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • Docket(#41) Docket Type: COURT ACTION FORM FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) Docket Type: NOTICE OF PRE-TRIAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • DocketSession Type: Pre-trial-PD-Bond; Court Officer: UPCHURCH; Location: Judge Upchurch Remote Zoom Hearing; Status: Pass-Reset

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • DocketSession Type: Pre-trial-PD-Bond; Trial Date/Time: 10/12/2020 08:30 AM; Court Officer: OTHER JUDGE; Location: Justice Center Courtroom 4; Status: Pass-Reset

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
36 More Docket Entries
  • 05/09/2020
  • DocketSession Type: First Appearance; Court Officer: OTHER JUDGE; Location: Branch Jail Courtroom 1; Status: FA Forms Printed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2020
  • Docket(#10) Docket Type: CITATION; Description: ACA37UE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2020
  • Docket(#9) Docket Type: CITATION; Description: ACA383E

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2020
  • Docket(#8) Docket Type: CITATION; Description: ACA381E

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2020
  • Docket(#7) Docket Type: CITATION; Description: ACA37TE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2020
  • Docket(#6) Docket Type: CITATION; Description: ACA382E

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2020
  • Docket(#5) Docket Type: CITATION; Description: ACA384E

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Docket Type: FIRST APPEARANCE ACTION FORM FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2020
  • Docket(#2) Docket Type: DRIVING RECORD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Docket Type: CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ###1ST COAST BAIL BONDS & SURETY AGENCY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer TERRY JONES

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHRISTOPHER WALKER