This case was last updated from Volusia County Circuit Courts on 11/14/2020 at 13:40:37 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA V. JOHN HENRY VAN KOOTEN

Case Summary

On 05/09/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against JOHN HENRY VAN KOOTEN. This case was filed in Volusia County Circuit Courts, Daytona Beach Justice Center located in Volusia, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are SANDRA C UPCHURCH, CRAIG and ZAMBRANO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************CFDB

  • Filing Date:

    05/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

SANDRA C UPCHURCH

CRAIG

ZAMBRANO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Daytona Beach, FL 32114

Defendant

JOHN HENRY VAN KOOTEN

Not Classified By Court

PRETRIAL SERVICES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BRIAN MCDONALD

SHONDA D WHITE

Defendant Attorney

NATALIE R. GOSSETT

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF PRE-TRIAL

11/03/2020 : NOTICE OF PRE-TRIAL

PRETRIAL SERVICES COURT COMMUNICATION

10/13/2020 : PRETRIAL SERVICES COURT COMMUNICATION

MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE

10/06/2020 : MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE

ORDER GRANTING CONTINUANCE

10/06/2020 : ORDER GRANTING CONTINUANCE

NOTICE OF PRE-TRIAL

10/06/2020 : NOTICE OF PRE-TRIAL

NOTICE OF PTL OR DKS/TRL RET'D

09/22/2020 : NOTICE OF PTL OR DKS/TRL RET'D

SUPPLEMENTAL WITNESS LIST

09/10/2020 : SUPPLEMENTAL WITNESS LIST

PRETRIAL SERVICES COURT COMMUNICATION

09/08/2020 : PRETRIAL SERVICES COURT COMMUNICATION

NOTICE OF PRE-TRIAL

08/26/2020 : NOTICE OF PRE-TRIAL

PRETRIAL SERVICES COURT COMMUNICATION

07/24/2020 : PRETRIAL SERVICES COURT COMMUNICATION

STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT W/WITNESS LIST AND DEMAND FOR RECIPROCAL DISCLOSURE

07/21/2020 : STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT W/WITNESS LIST AND DEMAND FOR RECIPROCAL DISCLOSURE

PRE-TRIAL SERVICES ORDERED

07/10/2020 : PRE-TRIAL SERVICES ORDERED

ORDER

07/02/2020 : ORDER

MOTION

07/02/2020 : MOTION

NOTICE OF SURETY BOND ESTR. PROCEEDING

06/16/2020 : NOTICE OF SURETY BOND ESTR. PROCEEDING

SURRENDER NOTICE/REQ. TO EXONERATE/CLK. RESP.

06/16/2020 : SURRENDER NOTICE/REQ. TO EXONERATE/CLK. RESP.

ADDRESS CHANGE/VERIFICATION FORM

06/15/2020 : ADDRESS CHANGE/VERIFICATION FORM

STATEMENT OF SURRENDER:

06/15/2020 : STATEMENT OF SURRENDER:

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketSession Type: Pre-trial-PD-Bond; Court Officer: UPCHURCH; Location: Judge Upchurch Remote Zoom Hearing; Status: Scheduled

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) Docket Type: NOTICE OF PRE-TRIAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • DocketSession Type: Pre-trial-PD-Bond; Court Officer: UPCHURCH; Location: Judge Upchurch Remote Zoom Hearing; Status: Continued by Defense w/WRST

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) Docket Type: PRETRIAL SERVICES COURT COMMUNICATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • DocketSession Type: Pre-trial-PD-Bond; Trial Date/Time: 11/30/2020 08:30 AM; Court Officer: OTHER JUDGE; Location: Justice Center Courtroom 4; Status: Pass-Reset

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) Docket Type: MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) Docket Type: ORDER GRANTING CONTINUANCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) Docket Type: NOTICE OF PRE-TRIAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) Docket Type: NOTICE OF PTL OR DKS/TRL RET'D

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) Docket Type: SUPPLEMENTAL WITNESS LIST

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 05/20/2020
  • DocketSession Type: Arraignment; Court Officer: UPCHURCH; Location: Branch Jail Courtroom 1; Status: Pass-Reset

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • DocketSession Type: Arraignment; Court Officer: CRAIG; Location: Branch Jail Courtroom 1; Status: Reset

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Docket Type: SURETY APPEARANCE BOND-ORIGINAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Docket Type: INFORMATION FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Docket Type: ORDER; Description: REDUCING BOND

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Docket Type: MOTION FOR BOND REDUCTION; Description: (STIPULATED)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Docket Type: NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2020
  • DocketSession Type: First Appearance; Court Officer: OTHER JUDGE; Location: Branch Jail Courtroom 1; Status: FA Forms Printed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Docket Type: FIRST APPEARANCE ACTION FORM FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Docket Type: CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PRETRIAL SERVICES is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BRIAN MCDONALD

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SHONDA D WHITE