This case was last updated from Volusia County Circuit Courts on 06/20/2020 at 23:16:18 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA V. JIMMY L GENT

Case Summary

On 05/09/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against JIMMY L GENT. This case was filed in Volusia County Circuit Courts, Daytona Beach Justice Center located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is RAUL A ZAMBRANO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************CFDB

  • Filing Date:

    05/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

RAUL A ZAMBRANO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Daytona Beach, FL 32114

Defendant

JIMMY L GENT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JACOB WESTBROOK

Defendant Attorney

MATTHEW METZ

 

Court Documents

CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

05/09/2020 : CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

FIRST APPEARANCE ACTION FORM FILED

05/09/2020 : FIRST APPEARANCE ACTION FORM FILED

NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE

05/11/2020 : NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CITATION

05/14/2020 : CITATION

CITATION

05/14/2020 : CITATION

CITATION

05/14/2020 : CITATION

CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

05/15/2020 : CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

05/15/2020 : CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

05/15/2020 : CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

05/15/2020 : CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

05/15/2020 : CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

05/15/2020 : CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

COURT ACTION FORM FILED

05/27/2020 : COURT ACTION FORM FILED

INFORMATION FILED

06/02/2020 : INFORMATION FILED

COURT ACTION FORM FILED

06/10/2020 : COURT ACTION FORM FILED

STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT W/WITNESS LIST AND DEMAND FOR RECIPROCAL DISCLOSURE

06/15/2020 : STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT W/WITNESS LIST AND DEMAND FOR RECIPROCAL DISCLOSURE

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Docket Type: STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT W/WITNESS LIST AND DEMAND FOR RECIPROCAL DISCLOSURE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Docket Type: COURT ACTION FORM FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Docket Type: INFORMATION FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Docket Type: COURT ACTION FORM FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Docket Type: CHARGING AFFIDAVIT; Description: SUPPLEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Docket Type: CHARGING AFFIDAVIT; Description: SUPPLEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Docket Type: CHARGING AFFIDAVIT; Description: SUPPLEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Docket Type: CHARGING AFFIDAVIT; Description: SUPPLEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Docket Type: CHARGING AFFIDAVIT; Description: SUPPLEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Docket Type: CHARGING AFFIDAVIT; Description: SUPPLEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Docket Type: CITATION; Description: ADF2V5E

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Docket Type: CITATION; Description: ADF2V4E

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Docket Type: CITATION; Description: ADF2V3E

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Docket Type: NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2020
  • Docket(#2) Docket Type: DRIVING RECORD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Docket Type: FIRST APPEARANCE ACTION FORM FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Docket Type: CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer JACOB WESTBROOK