Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Volusia County Circuit Courts on 02/19/2020 at 00:44:26 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA V. ERIC RODRIGUEZ

Case Summary

On 09/01/2019 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against ERIC RODRIGUEZ. This case was filed in Volusia County Circuit Courts, Volusia County Courthouse Deland located in Volusia, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are ROBERT A SANDERS JR and SANDERS. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************MMDL

  • Filing Date:

    09/01/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Volusia County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Volusia County Courthouse Deland

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

ROBERT A SANDERS JR

SANDERS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Daytona Beach, FL 32114

Defendant

ERIC RODRIGUEZ

Not Classified By Court

#1 ACE BAIL BONDS

3798 W. Intl Speedway Blvd

Daytona Beach, FL 32124

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

STATE ATTORNEY

251 N Ridgewood Ave

Daytona Beach, FL 32114

BOONE FORKNER

Defendant Attorney

CARLOS VIDAL-COLLAZO

211 E Rich Ave

Deland, FL 32724

 

Court Documents

PLEA AND WAIVER SIGNED

02/17/2020 : PLEA AND WAIVER SIGNED

PLEA AND WAIVER RECEIVED

02/17/2020 : PLEA AND WAIVER RECEIVED

NOTICE OF PRE-TRIAL

02/06/2020 : NOTICE OF PRE-TRIAL

NOTICE OF PRE-TRIAL

11/22/2019 : NOTICE OF PRE-TRIAL

NOTICE OF PRE-TRIAL

10/10/2019 : NOTICE OF PRE-TRIAL

WAIVED PRESENCE AT PRE-TRIAL

09/18/2019 : WAIVED PRESENCE AT PRE-TRIAL

SUPPLEMENTAL WITNESS LIST

09/17/2019 : SUPPLEMENTAL WITNESS LIST

DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY

09/09/2019 : DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE & PLEA OF NOT GUILTY:

09/09/2019 : NOTICE OF APPEARANCE & PLEA OF NOT GUILTY:

SURETY APPEARANCE BOND-ORIGINAL

09/03/2019 : SURETY APPEARANCE BOND-ORIGINAL

CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

09/01/2019 : CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/20/2020
  • HearingSession Type: Pre-trial-Private (Atty. L-Z); Trial Date/Time: 03/16/2020 08:30 AM; Court Officer: SANDERS; Location: DeLand Courtroom 3A; Status: Case Closed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Docket Type: PLEA AND WAIVER SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Docket Type: PLEA AND WAIVER RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Docket Type: NOTICE OF PRE-TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • HearingSession Type: Pre-trial-Private (Atty. L-Z); Trial Date/Time: 01/13/2020 08:30 AM; Court Officer: SANDERS; Location: DeLand Courtroom 3A; Status: Continued by Defense w/WRST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • Docket(#16) Docket Type: COURT ACTION FORM FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Docket Type: NOTICE OF PRE-TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • HearingSession Type: Pre-trial-Private (Atty. L-Z); Trial Date/Time: 11/04/2019 08:30 AM; Court Officer: SANDERS; Location: DeLand Courtroom 3A; Status: Continued by Defense w/WRST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • Docket(#14) Docket Type: COURT ACTION FORM FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Docket Type: NOTICE OF PRE-TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Docket Type: SUPPLEMENTAL WITNESS LIST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Docket Type: DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Docket Type: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE & PLEA OF NOT GUILTY:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • Docket(#2) Docket Type: DRIVING RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • Docket(#8) Docket Type: CITATION; Description: ABF86XE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • Docket(#7) Docket Type: CITATION; Description: A76NZLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Docket Type: SURETY APPEARANCE BOND-ORIGINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • Docket(#4) Docket Type: REFUSAL TO SUBMIT BREATH, URINE, OR BLOOD TEST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2019
  • HearingSession Type: First Appearance; Court Officer: OTHER JUDGE; Location: Branch Jail Courtroom 1; Status: FA Forms Printed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Docket Type: CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where #1 ACE BAIL BONDS is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CARLOS VIDAL-COLLAZO