This case was last updated from Volusia County Courts on 04/05/2020 at 08:17:47 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA V. ELIZABETH MARION DAQUILA

Case Summary

On 12/25/2019 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against ELIZABETH MARION DAQUILA. This case was filed in Volusia County Courts, Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex located in Volusia, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are FEIGENBAUM and BRYAN A FEIGENBAUM. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************MMDB

  • Filing Date:

    12/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

FEIGENBAUM

BRYAN A FEIGENBAUM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Daytona Beach, FL 32114

Defendant

ELIZABETH MARION DAQUILA

Not Classified By Court

PRETRIAL SERVICES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

STATE ATTORNEY

251 N Ridgewood Ave

Daytona Beach, FL 32114

ANGEL M DROLET

124 Faulkner St

New Smyrna Beach, FL 32168

Defendant Attorney

DONALD B DEMPSEY

120 E Rich Ave

Deland, FL 32724

 

Court Documents

ORDER REGARDING CONTACT BEFORE TRIAL

12/26/2019 : ORDER REGARDING CONTACT BEFORE TRIAL

CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

12/25/2019 : CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

FIRST APPEARANCE ACTION FORM FILED

12/26/2019 : FIRST APPEARANCE ACTION FORM FILED

PRE-TRIAL SERVICES ORDERED

12/27/2019 : PRE-TRIAL SERVICES ORDERED

NOTICE OF ARRAIGNMENT

12/30/2019 : NOTICE OF ARRAIGNMENT

NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE

12/30/2019 : NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE

NO INFORMATION FILED

01/02/2020 : NO INFORMATION FILED

REDUCED TO COUNTY COURT-COPY 707 :

01/02/2020 : REDUCED TO COUNTY COURT-COPY 707 :

INFORMATION FILED

01/02/2020 : INFORMATION FILED

NOTICE OF ARRAIGNMENT

01/07/2020 : NOTICE OF ARRAIGNMENT

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE & PLEA OF NOT GUILTY:

01/16/2020 : NOTICE OF APPEARANCE & PLEA OF NOT GUILTY:

NOTICE OF PRE-TRIAL

01/21/2020 : NOTICE OF PRE-TRIAL

STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT W/WITNESS LIST AND DEMAND FOR RECIPROCAL DISCLOSURE

01/23/2020 : STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT W/WITNESS LIST AND DEMAND FOR RECIPROCAL DISCLOSURE

COURT ACTION FORM FILED

02/04/2020 : COURT ACTION FORM FILED

NOTICE OF PRE-TRIAL

02/17/2020 : NOTICE OF PRE-TRIAL

COURT ACTION FORM FILED

03/03/2020 : COURT ACTION FORM FILED

NOLLE PROSSED

03/31/2020 : NOLLE PROSSED

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/05/2020
  • DocketSession Type: Pre-trial-Private; Trial Date/Time: 05/26/2020 08:30 AM; Court Officer: FEIGENBAUM; Location: DB Annex Courtroom 3; Status: Case Closed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • DocketSession Type: Pre-trial-Private; Trial Date/Time: 04/20/2020 08:30 AM; Court Officer: FEIGENBAUM; Location: DB Annex Courtroom 3; Status: Case Closed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Docket Type: NOLLE PROSSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • DocketSession Type: Pre-trial-Private; Trial Date/Time: 03/23/2020 08:30 AM; Court Officer: FEIGENBAUM; Location: DB Annex Courtroom 3; Status: Continued by Defense w/WRST

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Docket Type: COURT ACTION FORM FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Docket Type: NOTICE OF PRE-TRIAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketSession Type: Pre-trial-Private; Trial Date/Time: 02/24/2020 08:30 AM; Court Officer: FEIGENBAUM; Location: DB Annex Courtroom 3; Status: Continued by Defense w/WRST

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Docket Type: COURT ACTION FORM FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Docket Type: STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT W/WITNESS LIST AND DEMAND FOR RECIPROCAL DISCLOSURE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketSession Type: Arraignment-DV; Court Officer: FEIGENBAUM; Location: DB Annex Courtroom 3; Status: NG Plea-Set For Pre-Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Docket Type: NOTICE OF ARRAIGNMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Docket Type: INFORMATION FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Docket Type: REDUCED TO COUNTY COURT-COPY 707 :

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Docket Type: NO INFORMATION FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Docket Type: NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Docket Type: NOTICE OF ARRAIGNMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Docket Type: PRE-TRIAL SERVICES ORDERED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Docket Type: FIRST APPEARANCE ACTION FORM FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Docket Type: ORDER REGARDING CONTACT BEFORE TRIAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Docket Type: CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PRETRIAL SERVICES is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ANGEL M DROLET