Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Volusia County Circuit Courts on 10/15/2020 at 00:43:43 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA V. DUSTIN NILES HOLYKO

Case Summary

On 11/11/2019 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against DUSTIN NILES HOLYKO. This case was filed in Volusia County Circuit Courts, Daytona Beach Justice Center located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SANDRA C UPCHURCH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************CFDB

  • Filing Date:

    11/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Volusia County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Daytona Beach Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SANDRA C UPCHURCH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Daytona Beach, FL 32114

Defendant

DUSTIN NILES HOLYKO

Not Classified By Court

PRETRIAL SERVICES

EXPRESS BAIL BONDS VOLUSIA COUNTY

Daytona Beach, FL 32114

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

STATE ATTORNEY

251 N Ridgewood Ave

Daytona Beach, FL 32114

CHRISTOPHER WALKER

220 S.Ridgewood Ave. St.250

Daytona Beach, FL 32114

TERRY JONES

Defendant Attorney

JAMES A CROCKER

251 N Ridgewood Ave 3Rd Fl

Daytona Beach, FL 32114

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF PRE-TRIAL

09/29/2020 : NOTICE OF PRE-TRIAL

JUDGE'S ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF CORRESPONDENCE

09/17/2020 : JUDGE'S ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF CORRESPONDENCE

RECEIVED CORRESPONDENCE

09/17/2020 : RECEIVED CORRESPONDENCE

NOTICE OF PRE-TRIAL

09/10/2020 : NOTICE OF PRE-TRIAL

NOTICE OF PRE-TRIAL

07/21/2020 : NOTICE OF PRE-TRIAL

RECEIVED CORRESPONDENCE

07/08/2020 : RECEIVED CORRESPONDENCE

NOTICE OF PRE-TRIAL

06/24/2020 : NOTICE OF PRE-TRIAL

FTA INVESTIGATION

02/10/2020 : FTA INVESTIGATION

NOTICE OF PTL OR DKS/TRL RET'D

02/03/2020 : NOTICE OF PTL OR DKS/TRL RET'D

NOTICE OF PRE-TRIAL

01/17/2020 : NOTICE OF PRE-TRIAL

SURETY APPEARANCE BOND-ORIGINAL

12/26/2019 : SURETY APPEARANCE BOND-ORIGINAL

NOTICE OF ARN. RET'D

12/02/2019 : NOTICE OF ARN. RET'D

STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT W/WITNESS LIST AND DEMAND FOR RECIPROCAL DISCLOSURE

11/23/2019 : STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT W/WITNESS LIST AND DEMAND FOR RECIPROCAL DISCLOSURE

NOTICE OF ARRAIGNMENT

11/19/2019 : NOTICE OF ARRAIGNMENT

NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE

11/13/2019 : NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE

PRE-TRIAL SERVICES ORDERED

11/13/2019 : PRE-TRIAL SERVICES ORDERED

FIRST APPEARANCE ACTION FORM FILED

11/11/2019 : FIRST APPEARANCE ACTION FORM FILED

CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

11/11/2019 : CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketSession Type: Pre-trial-PD-Bond; Court Officer: UPCHURCH; Location: Justice Center Courtroom 4; Status: Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • Docket(#35) Docket Type: COURT ACTION FORM FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) Docket Type: NOTICE OF PRE-TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketSession Type: Pre-trial-PD-Bond; Court Officer: UPCHURCH; Location: Justice Center Courtroom 4; Status: Reset

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • Docket(#33) Docket Type: COURT ACTION FORM FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) Docket Type: JUDGE'S ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF CORRESPONDENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) Docket Type: RECEIVED CORRESPONDENCE; Description: PAUL HOLYKO - EMAILED TO DIV 40

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) Docket Type: NOTICE OF PRE-TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • DocketSession Type: Pre-trial-PD-Bond; Trial Date/Time: 10/12/2020 08:30 AM; Court Officer: OTHER JUDGE; Location: Justice Center Courtroom 4; Status: Pass-Reset

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • DocketSession Type: Pre-trial-PD-Bond; Court Officer: UPCHURCH; Location: Judge Upchurch Remote Zoom Hearing; Status: Reset

    Read MoreRead Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 12/03/2019
  • Docket(#10) Docket Type: COURT ACTION FORM FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Docket Type: NOTICE OF ARN. RET'D

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Docket Type: STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT W/WITNESS LIST AND DEMAND FOR RECIPROCAL DISCLOSURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Docket Type: NOTICE OF ARRAIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • Docket(#6) Docket Type: INFORMATION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Docket Type: NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Docket Type: PRE-TRIAL SERVICES ORDERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2019
  • DocketSession Type: First Appearance; Court Officer: OTHER JUDGE; Location: Branch Jail Courtroom 1; Status: Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Docket Type: FIRST APPEARANCE ACTION FORM FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Docket Type: CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PRETRIAL SERVICES is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer TERRY JONES

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHRISTOPHER WALKER