Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Volusia County Courts on 08/07/2020 at 20:11:17 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA V. DAVID WILLIAM CORMIER

Case Summary

On 12/15/2019 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against DAVID WILLIAM CORMIER. This case was filed in Volusia County Courts, Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex located in Volusia, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are BELLE SCHUMANN and SCHUMANN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************MMDB

  • Filing Date:

    12/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Volusia County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

BELLE SCHUMANN

SCHUMANN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Daytona Beach, FL 32114

Defendant

DAVID WILLIAM CORMIER

Not Classified By Court

#1 ACE BAIL BONDS

3798 W. Intl Speedway Blvd

Daytona Beach, FL 32124

PRETRIAL SERVICES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

STATE ATTORNEY

251 N Ridgewood Ave

Daytona Beach, FL 32114

NANCY C SIMPSON

MCKENNA MUNDY

PENDING BAR NUMBER

Defendant Attorney

SHAVONNE J. MCCANTS

 

Court Documents

ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT OF JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE

08/06/2020 : ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT OF JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE

NOTICE OF PRE-TRIAL

06/16/2020 : NOTICE OF PRE-TRIAL

NOTICE OF PRE-TRIAL

03/19/2020 : NOTICE OF PRE-TRIAL

PRETRIAL SERVICES COURT COMMUNICATION

03/05/2020 : PRETRIAL SERVICES COURT COMMUNICATION

NOTICE OF PRE-TRIAL

02/24/2020 : NOTICE OF PRE-TRIAL

RECEIVED CORRESPONDENCE

02/19/2020 : RECEIVED CORRESPONDENCE

RECEIVED CORRESPONDENCE

02/18/2020 : RECEIVED CORRESPONDENCE

NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE

01/27/2020 : NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE

NOTICE OF PRE-TRIAL

01/27/2020 : NOTICE OF PRE-TRIAL

NOTICE OF ARN. RET'D

01/06/2020 : NOTICE OF ARN. RET'D

NO INFORMATION FILED

12/30/2019 : NO INFORMATION FILED

NOTICE OF ARRAIGNMENT

12/20/2019 : NOTICE OF ARRAIGNMENT

NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE

12/18/2019 : NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE

PRE-TRIAL SERVICES ORDERED

12/17/2019 : PRE-TRIAL SERVICES ORDERED

SURETY APPEARANCE BOND-ORIGINAL

12/16/2019 : SURETY APPEARANCE BOND-ORIGINAL

FIRST APPEARANCE ACTION FORM FILED

12/15/2019 : FIRST APPEARANCE ACTION FORM FILED

CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

12/15/2019 : CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

ORDER REGARDING CONTACT BEFORE TRIAL

12/15/2019 : ORDER REGARDING CONTACT BEFORE TRIAL

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/07/2020
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 221.00; Final Amount: 221.00; Credits: 0.00; Balance: 221.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 2.00; Final Amount: 2.00; Credits: 0.00; Balance: 2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 50.00; Final Amount: 50.00; Credits: 0.00; Balance: 50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • Docket(#30) Docket Type: JUDGMENT & SENTENCE FILED; Description: Instrument: 2020146392 Book: 7891 Page: 3799

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • DocketSession Type: Status Conference; Court Officer: SCHUMANN; Location: Courtroom 1 Sunshine Plaza; Status: Case Closed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) Docket Type: ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT OF JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) Docket Type: NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • DocketSession Type: Pre-trial-PD-Unrep (Def. A-L); Trial Date/Time: 07/13/2020 08:30 AM; Court Officer: SCHUMANN; Location: DB Annex Courtroom 4; Status: Cancelled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • DocketSession Type: Pre-trial-PD-Unrep (Def. A-L); Trial Date/Time: 07/13/2020 08:30 AM; Court Officer: SCHUMANN; Location: Judge Schumann Remote Zoom Hearing; Status: Reset

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) Docket Type: NOTICE OF PRE-TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 01/02/2020
  • Docket(#10) Docket Type: INFORMATION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Docket Type: NO INFORMATION FILED; Description: COUNT 1 ONLY STALKING(DOMESTIC VIOLENCE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Docket Type: NOTICE OF ARRAIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Docket Type: NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Docket Type: PRE-TRIAL SERVICES ORDERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Docket Type: SURETY APPEARANCE BOND-ORIGINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2019
  • DocketSession Type: First Appearance; Court Officer: OTHER JUDGE; Location: Branch Jail Courtroom 1; Status: FA Forms Printed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Docket Type: FIRST APPEARANCE ACTION FORM FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Docket Type: ORDER REGARDING CONTACT BEFORE TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Docket Type: CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where #1 ACE BAIL BONDS is a litigant

Latest cases where PRETRIAL SERVICES is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer NANCY C SIMPSON

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MCKENNA MUNDY