This case was last updated from Volusia County Circuit Courts on 11/15/2020 at 02:42:08 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA V. DAMON L GAUSE

Case Summary

On 02/27/2019 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against DAMON L GAUSE. This case was filed in Volusia County Circuit Courts, Daytona Beach Justice Center located in Volusia, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are CRAIG and DENNIS CRAIG. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************CFDB

  • Filing Date:

    02/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

CRAIG

DENNIS CRAIG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Daytona Beach, FL 32114

Defendant

DAMON L GAUSE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STATE ATTORNEY

251 N Ridgewood Ave

Daytona Beach, FL 32114

Defendant Attorney

MICHAEL P. KAPIT

 

Court Documents

ORDER GRANTING CONTINUANCE

10/02/2020 : ORDER GRANTING CONTINUANCE

MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE

10/01/2020 : MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE

ORDER GRANTING CONTINUANCE

08/31/2020 : ORDER GRANTING CONTINUANCE

COURT ACTION FORM FILED

06/01/2020 : COURT ACTION FORM FILED

NOTICE OF DOCKET SOUNDING

02/25/2020 : NOTICE OF DOCKET SOUNDING

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

02/24/2020 : NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

11/26/2019 : NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

10/10/2019 : NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

10/02/2019 : NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

NOTICE

10/02/2019 : NOTICE

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

09/12/2019 : NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

09/12/2019 : NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

07/23/2019 : NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

COURT ACTION FORM FILED

07/09/2019 : COURT ACTION FORM FILED

SUPPLEMENTAL WITNESS LIST

06/24/2019 : SUPPLEMENTAL WITNESS LIST

INFORMATION FILED

05/15/2019 : INFORMATION FILED

COURT ACTION FORM FILED

04/03/2019 : COURT ACTION FORM FILED

CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

02/27/2019 : CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

45 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/07/2020
  • DocketSession Type: Pre-trial; Court Officer: CRAIG; Location: Branch Jail Courtroom 1; Status: Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • DocketSession Type: Pre-trial; Court Officer: CRAIG; Location: Branch Jail Courtroom 1; Status: Continued by Defense

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#59) Docket Type: ORDER GRANTING CONTINUANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#58) Docket Type: NOTICE; Description: OF FILING TRANSCRIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#56) Docket Type: MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE; Description: UNOPPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#57) Docket Type: DEPOSITION OF; Description: OFFICER KEATON LABRIE 11/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketSession Type: Pre-trial; Court Officer: CRAIG; Location: Branch Jail Courtroom 1; Status: Continued by Defense w/WRST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#55) Docket Type: ORDER GRANTING CONTINUANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#54) Docket Type: MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE; Description: MOTION FOR UNOPPOSED CONTINUANCE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • DocketSession Type: Pre-trial; Court Officer: CRAIG; Location: Branch Jail Courtroom 1; Status: Continued by Defense w/WRST

    Read MoreRead Less
54 More Docket Entries
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Docket Type: NOTICE OF ARN. RET'D

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Docket Type: INFORMATION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Docket Type: NO INFORMATION FILED; Description: EMAILED TO BOOKING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Docket Type: NOTICE OF ARRAIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 50.00; Final Amount: 50.00; Credits: 0.00; Balance: 50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • Docket(#5) Docket Type: AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENCE/INDIGENT/ORDER APPT.PD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Docket Type: NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • DocketSession Type: First Appearance; Court Officer: OTHER JUDGE; Location: Branch Jail Courtroom 1; Status: FA Forms Printed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Docket Type: FIRST APPEARANCE ACTION FORM FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Docket Type: CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less