This case was last updated from Volusia County Circuit Courts on 11/14/2020 at 16:38:11 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA V. CORY ALEXANDER DEWITT

Case Summary

On 05/07/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against CORY ALEXANDER DEWITT. This case was filed in Volusia County Circuit Courts, Daytona Beach Justice Center located in Volusia, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are DENNIS CRAIG and CRAIG. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************CFDB

  • Filing Date:

    05/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

DENNIS CRAIG

CRAIG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

CORY ALEXANDER DEWITT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DANIELLE FIELDS

Defendant Attorney

BRIAN F. SMITH

 

Court Documents

CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

05/07/2020 : CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE

05/08/2020 : NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE

FIRST APPEARANCE ACTION FORM FILED

05/08/2020 : FIRST APPEARANCE ACTION FORM FILED

WRITTEN PLEA NOT GUILTY

05/18/2020 : WRITTEN PLEA NOT GUILTY

SURETY APPEARANCE BOND-ORIGINAL

06/03/2020 : SURETY APPEARANCE BOND-ORIGINAL

STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT W/WITNESS LIST AND DEMAND FOR RECIPROCAL DISCLOSURE

06/26/2020 : STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT W/WITNESS LIST AND DEMAND FOR RECIPROCAL DISCLOSURE

STATEMENT OF SURRENDER:

07/08/2020 : STATEMENT OF SURRENDER:

SURRENDER NOTICE/REQ. TO EXONERATE/CLK. RESP.

07/13/2020 : SURRENDER NOTICE/REQ. TO EXONERATE/CLK. RESP.

NOTICE OF SURETY BOND ESTR. PROCEEDING

07/14/2020 : NOTICE OF SURETY BOND ESTR. PROCEEDING

RCV'D CORRESPONDENCE FROM DEF

08/17/2020 : RCV'D CORRESPONDENCE FROM DEF

MOTION FOR BOND REDUCTION

11/04/2020 : MOTION FOR BOND REDUCTION

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/07/2020
  • DocketSession Type: Pre-trial; Court Officer: CRAIG; Location: Branch Jail Courtroom 1; Status: Scheduled

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Docket Type: MOTION FOR BOND REDUCTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketSession Type: Pre-trial; Court Officer: CRAIG; Location: Branch Jail Courtroom 1; Status: Continued by Defense

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • Docket(#14) Docket Type: COURT ACTION FORM FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Docket Type: RCV'D CORRESPONDENCE FROM DEF; Description: (COPIES SENT TO SAO AND PD)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • DocketSession Type: Pre-trial-PD; Court Officer: CRAIG; Location: Judge Craig Remote Zoom Hearing; Status: Reset

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • DocketSession Type: Pre-trial; Court Officer: CRAIG; Location: Branch Jail Courtroom 1; Status: Continued by Defense w/WRST

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • Docket(#12) Docket Type: COURT ACTION FORM FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • DocketSession Type: Pre-trial-PD; Court Officer: CRAIG; Location: Judge Craig Remote Zoom Hearing; Status: Reset

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Docket Type: NOTICE OF SURETY BOND ESTR. PROCEEDING; Description: POWER #AS6K-709600 **BOND EXONERATED**

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 06/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Docket Type: SURETY APPEARANCE BOND-ORIGINAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • DocketSession Type: Arraignment-Custody; Court Officer: CRAIG; Location: Justice Center Courtroom 1; Status: NG Plea-Set For Pre-Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • DocketSession Type: Arraignment; Court Officer: CRAIG; Location: Branch Jail Courtroom 1; Status: Reset

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Docket Type: WRITTEN PLEA NOT GUILTY; Description: AND WAIVER OF APPERANCE AT ARRAIGNMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • Docket(#5) Docket Type: INFORMATION FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • DocketSession Type: First Appearance; Court Officer: OTHER JUDGE; Location: Branch Jail Courtroom 1; Status: FA Forms Printed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Docket Type: FIRST APPEARANCE ACTION FORM FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Docket Type: NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Docket Type: CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • DocketSession Type: Pre-trial-PD; Trial Date/Time: 07/20/2020 08:30 AM; Court Officer: CRAIG; Location: Justice Center Courtroom 1; Status: Reset

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer DANIELLE FIELDS