This case was last updated from Volusia County Courts on 11/14/2020 at 02:00:03 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA V. CORNELIUS MCCRAE JOHNSON

Case Summary

On 12/04/2019 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against CORNELIUS MCCRAE JOHNSON. This case was filed in Volusia County Courts, Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex located in Volusia, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are BELLE SCHUMANN, SANDERS and SCHUMANN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************MMDB

  • Filing Date:

    12/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

BELLE SCHUMANN

SANDERS

SCHUMANN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Daytona Beach, FL 32114

Defendant

CORNELIUS MCCRAE JOHNSON

Not Classified By Court

EXPRESS BAIL BONDS VOLUSIA COUNTY

Daytona Beach, FL 32114

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MCKENNA MUNDY

VANESSA BROOKS

Defendant Attorney

SHAVONNE J. MCCANTS

 

Court Documents

SURETY APPEARANCE BOND-ORIGINAL

12/06/2019 : SURETY APPEARANCE BOND-ORIGINAL

NOTICE OF ARRAIGNMENT

12/17/2019 : NOTICE OF ARRAIGNMENT

CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

12/04/2019 : CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

NOTICE OF ARRAIGNMENT

01/09/2020 : NOTICE OF ARRAIGNMENT

NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE

01/13/2020 : NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE

NOTICE OF PRE-TRIAL

01/27/2020 : NOTICE OF PRE-TRIAL

STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT W/WITNESS LIST AND DEMAND FOR RECIPROCAL DISCLOSURE

01/28/2020 : STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT W/WITNESS LIST AND DEMAND FOR RECIPROCAL DISCLOSURE

NOTICE OF PRE-TRIAL

02/24/2020 : NOTICE OF PRE-TRIAL

NOTICE OF PRE-TRIAL

03/19/2020 : NOTICE OF PRE-TRIAL

NOTICE OF PRE-TRIAL

06/16/2020 : NOTICE OF PRE-TRIAL

NOTICE OF PRE-TRIAL

07/06/2020 : NOTICE OF PRE-TRIAL

NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE

07/24/2020 : NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE

NOTICE OF PRE-TRIAL

09/21/2020 : NOTICE OF PRE-TRIAL

NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE

10/23/2020 : NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/07/2020
  • DocketSession Type: Pre-trial-PD-Unrep (Def. A-L); Court Officer: SCHUMANN; Location: Judge Schumann Remote Zoom Hearing; Status: Scheduled

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • DocketSession Type: Status Conference; Court Officer: SCHUMANN; Location: Courtroom 1 Sunshine Plaza; Status: Continued by Defense w/WRST

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • Docket(#26) Docket Type: COURT ACTION FORM FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) Docket Type: NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketSession Type: Pre-trial-PD-Unrep (Def. A-L); Court Officer: SCHUMANN; Location: Judge Schumann Remote Zoom Hearing; Status: Reset

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • Docket(#24) Docket Type: COURT ACTION FORM FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) Docket Type: NOTICE OF PRE-TRIAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • DocketSession Type: Status Conference; Court Officer: SCHUMANN; Location: Courtroom 1 Sunshine Plaza; Status: Continued by Defense

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • Docket(#22) Docket Type: COURT ACTION FORM FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) Docket Type: NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 01/23/2020
  • Docket(#9) Docket Type: COURT ACTION FORM FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Docket Type: NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Docket Type: NOTICE OF ARRAIGNMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • Docket(#6) Docket Type: COPY APP OF INDIGENCE/INDIGENT/ORDER APPT PD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • DocketSession Type: Arraignment; Court Officer: SCHUMANN; Location: DB Annex Courtroom 4; Status: Reset

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • Docket(#5) Docket Type: COURT ACTION FORM FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Docket Type: NOTICE OF ARRAIGNMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Docket Type: SURETY APPEARANCE BOND-ORIGINAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketSession Type: First Appearance; Court Officer: SANDERS; Location: Branch Jail Courtroom 1; Status: FA Forms Printed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Docket Type: CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SHAVONNE J. MCCANTS