This case was last updated from Volusia County Circuit Courts on 09/24/2020 at 00:44:52 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA V. CHRISTOPHER JOHN DUNKEL

Case Summary

On 12/31/2019 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against CHRISTOPHER JOHN DUNKEL. This case was filed in Volusia County Circuit Courts, Daytona Beach Justice Center located in Volusia, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are SANDRA C UPCHURCH and CROMARTIE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************CFDB

  • Filing Date:

    12/31/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

SANDRA C UPCHURCH

CROMARTIE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Daytona Beach, FL 32114

Defendant

CHRISTOPHER JOHN DUNKEL

Not Classified By Court

EXPRESS BAIL BONDS VOLUSIA COUNTY

Daytona Beach, FL 32114

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

STATE ATTORNEY

251 N Ridgewood Ave

Daytona Beach, FL 32114

TERRY JONES

JOSEPH LEDONNE

Defendant Attorney

JAMES A CROCKER

251 North Ridgewood Avenue Third Floor

Daytona Beach, FL 32114

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF PRE-TRIAL

09/08/2020 : NOTICE OF PRE-TRIAL

COURT ACTION FORM FILED

08/05/2020 : COURT ACTION FORM FILED

COURT ACTION FORM FILED

07/08/2020 : COURT ACTION FORM FILED

NOTICE OF PRE-TRIAL

06/24/2020 : NOTICE OF PRE-TRIAL

COURT ACTION FORM FILED

03/04/2020 : COURT ACTION FORM FILED

NOTICE OF PTL OR DKS/TRL RET'D

02/28/2020 : NOTICE OF PTL OR DKS/TRL RET'D

AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENCE/INDIGENT/ORDER APPT.PD

01/21/2020 : AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENCE/INDIGENT/ORDER APPT.PD

NOTICE OF PRE-TRIAL

02/14/2020 : NOTICE OF PRE-TRIAL

SUPPLEMENTAL WITNESS LIST

01/24/2020 : SUPPLEMENTAL WITNESS LIST

COURT ACTION FORM FILED

01/21/2020 : COURT ACTION FORM FILED

STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT W/WITNESS LIST AND DEMAND FOR RECIPROCAL DISCLOSURE

01/16/2020 : STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT W/WITNESS LIST AND DEMAND FOR RECIPROCAL DISCLOSURE

CITATION

01/06/2020 : CITATION

CITATION

01/06/2020 : CITATION

INFORMATION FILED

01/02/2020 : INFORMATION FILED

SURETY APPEARANCE BOND-ORIGINAL

01/01/2020 : SURETY APPEARANCE BOND-ORIGINAL

SURETY APPEARANCE BOND-ORIGINAL

01/01/2020 : SURETY APPEARANCE BOND-ORIGINAL

FIRST APPEARANCE ACTION FORM FILED

12/31/2019 : FIRST APPEARANCE ACTION FORM FILED

CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

12/31/2019 : CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketSession Type: Pre-trial-PD-Bond; Court Officer: UPCHURCH; Location: Judge Upchurch Remote Zoom Hearing; Status: Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketSession Type: Pre-trial-PD-Bond; Court Officer: UPCHURCH; Location: Judge Upchurch Remote Zoom Hearing; Status: Continued by Defense w/WRST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • Docket(#29) Docket Type: COURT ACTION FORM FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) Docket Type: NOTICE OF PRE-TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • DocketSession Type: Pre-trial-PD-Bond; Trial Date/Time: 10/12/2020 08:30 AM; Court Officer: OTHER JUDGE; Location: Justice Center Courtroom 4; Status: Pass-Reset

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • DocketSession Type: Pre-trial-PD-Bond; Court Officer: UPCHURCH; Location: Judge Upchurch Remote Zoom Hearing; Status: Continued by Defense w/WRST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) Docket Type: COURT ACTION FORM FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) Docket Type: NOTICE OF PTL OR DKS/TRL RET'D

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) Docket Type: NOTICE OF PTL OR DKS/TRL RET'D

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) Docket Type: NOTICE OF PRE-TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Docket Type: CITATION; Description: A3BFMHP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Docket Type: INFORMATION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Docket Type: NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Docket Type: SURETY APPEARANCE BOND-ORIGINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Docket Type: SURETY APPEARANCE BOND-ORIGINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Docket Type: SURETY APPEARANCE BOND-ORIGINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • DocketSession Type: First Appearance; Court Officer: OTHER JUDGE; Location: Branch Jail Courtroom 1; Status: FA Forms Printed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Docket Type: FIRST APPEARANCE ACTION FORM FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • Docket(#2) Docket Type: DRIVING RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Docket Type: CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer JAMES A CROCKER