Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Volusia County Courts on 03/11/2020 at 01:40:09 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA V. CASSANDRA HUTCHINS

Case Summary

On 09/03/2019 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against CASSANDRA HUTCHINS. This case was filed in Volusia County Courts, Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex located in Volusia, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are BELLE SCHUMANN and SCHUMANN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************MMDB

  • Filing Date:

    09/03/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Volusia County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

BELLE SCHUMANN

SCHUMANN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Daytona Beach, FL 32114

Defendant

CASSANDRA HUTCHINS

Not Classified By Court

ALLIANCE BAIL BONDS

Daytona Beach, FL 32124

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

STATE ATTORNEY

251 N Ridgewood Ave

Daytona Beach, FL 32114

ANGEL M DROLET

124 Faulkner St

New Smyrna Beach, FL 32168

LAURA ROJAS GLAD

444 Seabreeze Blvd Ste 360

Daytona Beach, FL 32118

MCKENNA MUNDY

Defendant Attorney

GEORGE TROVATO

Attorney at PRINCIPLE LEGAL OFFICES PA

200 E Graves Ave

Orange City, FL 32763

 

Court Documents

RCV'D CORRESPONDENCE FROM DEF

10/11/2019 : RCV'D CORRESPONDENCE FROM DEF

SURETY APPEARANCE BOND-ORIGINAL

09/05/2019 : SURETY APPEARANCE BOND-ORIGINAL

SURETY APPEARANCE BOND-ORIGINAL

09/05/2019 : SURETY APPEARANCE BOND-ORIGINAL

STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT W/WITNESS LIST AND DEMAND FOR RECIPROCAL DISCLOSURE

12/03/2019 : STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT W/WITNESS LIST AND DEMAND FOR RECIPROCAL DISCLOSURE

NOTICE OF PRE-TRIAL

12/27/2019 : NOTICE OF PRE-TRIAL

NOTICE OF ARRAIGNMENT

09/26/2019 : NOTICE OF ARRAIGNMENT

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE & PLEA OF NOT GUILTY:

10/09/2019 : NOTICE OF APPEARANCE & PLEA OF NOT GUILTY:

CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

09/12/2019 : CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

NO INFORMATION FILED

09/10/2019 : NO INFORMATION FILED

SURETY APPEARANCE BOND-ORIGINAL

09/05/2019 : SURETY APPEARANCE BOND-ORIGINAL

MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE

10/30/2019 : MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE

ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT OF JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE

03/10/2020 : ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT OF JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE

ORDER GRANTING CONTINUANCE

02/07/2020 : ORDER GRANTING CONTINUANCE

NOTICE OF PRE-TRIAL

02/24/2020 : NOTICE OF PRE-TRIAL

WRITTEN PLEA FORM FILED

03/10/2020 : WRITTEN PLEA FORM FILED

NOTICE OF PRE-TRIAL

10/29/2019 : NOTICE OF PRE-TRIAL

NOTICE OF PRE-TRIAL

11/18/2019 : NOTICE OF PRE-TRIAL

CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

09/03/2019 : CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/10/2020
  • HearingSession Type: Pre-trial-Private; Trial Date/Time: 03/30/2020 08:30 AM; Court Officer: SCHUMANN; Location: DB Annex Courtroom 4; Status: Case Closed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • Docket(#32) Docket Type: JUDGMENT & SENTENCE FILED; Description: Instrument: 2020050426 Book: 7826 Page: 3626

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) Docket Type: WRITTEN PLEA FORM FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) Docket Type: ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT OF JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) Docket Type: NOTICE OF PRE-TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • HearingSession Type: Pre-trial-Private; Trial Date/Time: 02/24/2020 08:30 AM; Court Officer: SCHUMANN; Location: DB Annex Courtroom 4; Status: Continued by Defense

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) Docket Type: ORDER GRANTING CONTINUANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) Docket Type: MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) Docket Type: NOTICE OF PRE-TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • HearingSession Type: Criminal Hearing; Court Officer: SCHUMANN; Location: DB Annex Courtroom 4; Status: Continued by Defense

    Read MoreRead Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 09/10/2019
  • Docket(#10) Docket Type: INFORMATION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • Docket(#9) Docket Type: REDUCED TO COUNTY COURT-COPY 707 :

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Docket Type: NO INFORMATION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • Docket(#2) Docket Type: DRIVING RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Docket Type: SURETY APPEARANCE BOND-ORIGINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Docket Type: SURETY APPEARANCE BOND-ORIGINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Docket Type: SURETY APPEARANCE BOND-ORIGINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • Docket(#4) Docket Type: CITATION; Description: ABM7CBE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • Docket(#3) Docket Type: CITATION; Description: ABM7CAE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Docket Type: CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less