This case was last updated from Volusia County Circuit Courts on 05/14/2020 at 06:41:47 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA V. BOBBY L WRIGHT

Case Summary

On 08/19/2019 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against BOBBY L WRIGHT. This case was filed in Volusia County Circuit Courts, Daytona Beach Justice Center located in Volusia, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are FOXMAN and MATTHEW M FOXMAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************CFDB

  • Filing Date:

    08/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

FOXMAN

MATTHEW M FOXMAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Daytona Beach, FL 32114

Defendant

BOBBY L WRIGHT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STATE ATTORNEY

251 N Ridgewood Ave

Daytona Beach, FL 32114

Defendant Attorney

FRANK W SCOTT

251 N Ridgewood Ave

Daytona Beach, FL 32114

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF PRE-TRIAL

02/20/2020 : NOTICE OF PRE-TRIAL

STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT W/WITNESS LIST AND DEMAND FOR RECIPROCAL DISCLOSURE

02/07/2020 : STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT W/WITNESS LIST AND DEMAND FOR RECIPROCAL DISCLOSURE

NOTICE OF PRE-TRIAL

12/27/2019 : NOTICE OF PRE-TRIAL

WAIVED PRESENCE AT PRE-TRIAL

12/13/2019 : WAIVED PRESENCE AT PRE-TRIAL

NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE

11/14/2019 : NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE

NOTICE OF PRE-TRIAL

10/25/2019 : NOTICE OF PRE-TRIAL

NOTICE OF ARRAIGNMENT

08/27/2019 : NOTICE OF ARRAIGNMENT

CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

08/19/2019 : CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/12/2020
  • DocketSession Type: Pre-trial-PD-Bond; Trial Date/Time: 06/01/2020 08:30 AM; Court Officer: FOXMAN; Location: Justice Center Courtroom 6; Status: Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • DocketSession Type: Pre-trial-PD-Bond; Trial Date/Time: 04/06/2020 08:30 AM; Court Officer: FOXMAN; Location: Justice Center Courtroom 6; Status: Continued by Defense

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • Docket(#14) Docket Type: COURT ACTION FORM FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Docket Type: NOTICE OF PRE-TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Docket Type: STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT W/WITNESS LIST AND DEMAND FOR RECIPROCAL DISCLOSURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketSession Type: Pre-trial-PD-Bond; Trial Date/Time: 02/03/2020 08:30 AM; Court Officer: FOXMAN; Location: Justice Center Courtroom 6; Status: Continued by Defense

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • Docket(#11) Docket Type: COURT ACTION FORM FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Docket Type: NOTICE OF PRE-TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Docket Type: WAIVED PRESENCE AT PRE-TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 50.00; Final Amount: 50.00; Credits: 0.00; Balance: 50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Docket Type: NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • DocketSession Type: Pre-trial-Private; Trial Date/Time: 12/02/2019 08:30 AM; Court Officer: FOXMAN; Location: Justice Center Courtroom 6; Status: Continued by Defense w/WRST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • Docket(#7) Docket Type: AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENCE/INDIGENT/ORDER APPT.PD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • Docket(#6) Docket Type: COURT ACTION FORM FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Docket Type: NOTICE OF PRE-TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • DocketSession Type: Arraignment; Court Officer: FOXMAN; Location: Justice Center Courtroom 6; Status: NG Plea-Set For Pre-Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • Docket(#4) Docket Type: COURT ACTION FORM FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Docket Type: NOTICE OF ARRAIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • Docket(#2) Docket Type: INFORMATION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Docket Type: CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer FRANK W SCOTT