Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Volusia County Courts on 02/28/2020 at 00:26:13 (UTC).

YVETTE M MERRIWEATHER V. MEGEAN E MERRIWEATHER

Case Summary

On 07/31/2019 YVETTE M MERRIWEATHER filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against MEGEAN E MERRIWEATHER. This case was filed in Volusia County Courts, Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Stasia Warren. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********FMCI

  • Filing Date:

    07/31/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Volusia County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Stasia Warren

 

Party Details

Petitioner

YVETTE M MERRIWEATHER

Respondent

MEGEAN E MERRIWEATHER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

ROBERT STEPNIAK

150 S Palmetto Ave Suite 100

Daytona Beach, FL 32114

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/19/2020
  • Docket(#34) Docket Type: FINAL ORDER / JUDGMENT FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE; Description: Instrument: 2020037097 Book: 7817 Page: 4498

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • HearingSession Type: Hearing; Court Officer: Stasia Warren; Location: CI-11, City Island Courthouse; Status: Scheduled; Comments: **final** docket #2,#29 & #24

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • Docket(#33) Docket Type: HEARING SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • Docket(#32) Docket Type: NOTICE OF FILING; Description: proof of residence by pet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • Docket(#31) Docket Type: NOTICE OF FILING; Description: att'd return of non service on resp

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • Docket(#30) Docket Type: NOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • Docket(#29) Docket Type: DEFAULT; Description: as to Megean E Merriweather

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • Docket(#28) Docket Type: MOTION OF/FOR DEFAULT; Description: as to Resp

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • Docket(#27) Docket Type: ORDER OF CASE MANAGEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • HearingSession Type: Case Management Conference; Court Officer: Stasia Warren; Location: CI-11, City Island Courthouse; Status: Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 08/01/2019
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 408.00; Final Amount: 408.00; Credits: -408.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 10.00; Final Amount: 10.00; Credits: -10.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • Docket(#8) Docket Type: SUMMONS ISSUED; Description: as to PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE & OTHER RELIEF To MEGEAN E MERRIWEATHER Orig/e-served to atty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • Docket(#7) Docket Type: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS; Description: by Yvette M Merriweather

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • Docket(#6) Docket Type: NOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • Docket(#5) Docket Type: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Description: & email address by Atty Stepniak obo Yvette M Merriweather

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • Docket(#4) Docket Type: PROPOSED; Description: BVS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • Docket(#3) Docket Type: FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT; Description: by Yvette Merriweather

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • Docket(#2) Docket Type: PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • Docket(#1) Docket Type: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROBERT STEPNIAK