This case was last updated from Volusia County Courts on 11/06/2021 at 18:32:20 (UTC).

YAVE YIRE ENTERPRISES INC FORMERLY D B A ROOF DEPOT INC A A O WENDI CASSAND, ETC., ET AL V. SECURITY FIRST INSURANCE COMPANY D B A SECURITY FIRST FLORIDA

Case Summary

On 10/07/2021 YAVE YIRE ENTERPRISES INC FORMERLY D B A ROOF DEPOT INC A A O WENDI CASSAND, ETC filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against SECURITY FIRST INSURANCE COMPANY D B A SECURITY FIRST FLORIDA. This case was filed in Volusia County Courts, Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Leah R. Case. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********CICI

  • Filing Date:

    10/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Leah R. Case

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

YAVE YIRE ENTERPRISES INC FORMERLY D B A ROOF DEPOT INC A A O WENDI CASSAND

ROOF DEPOT INC

WENDI CASSAND

COHEN LAW GROUP

Maitland, FL 32751

Defendants

SECURITY FIRST INSURANCE COMPANY D B A SECURITY FIRST FLORIDA

Tallahassee, FL 32302

SECURITY FIRST FLORIDA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DAVID WILLIAM DAVICH

Attorney at COHEN LAW GROUP

350 N Lake Destiny Rd

Maitland, FL 32751

Defendant Attorney

JEFFREY M THOMPSON

Alvarez Winthrop Thompson Storp O Box 3511

Orlando, FL 32802

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

10/07/2021 : CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

10/07/2021 : COMPLAINT

REQUEST SUMMONS

10/07/2021 : REQUEST SUMMONS

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

10/07/2021 : NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

10/07/2021 : REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

10/07/2021 : REQUEST TO PRODUCE

TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

10/15/2021 : TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

10/22/2021 : NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

10/22/2021 : NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

10/25/2021 : NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS

10/25/2021 : DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS

DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS

10/27/2021 : DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Docket Type: DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS; Description: (amd) Sean P Fann

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Docket Type: DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS; Description: by Jeffrey M Thompson Esq

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Docket Type: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Description: (special) of Jeffrey M Thompson Esq obo Security First Insurance Company etc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Docket Type: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS; Description: by CFO obo Security First Ins Co

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Docket Type: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Description: of David William Davich Esq obo Yave Yire Enterprises Inc etc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Docket Type: TWENTY DAY SUMMONS; Description: To SECURITY FIRST INSURANCE COMPANY D/B/A SECURITY FIRST FLORIDA forwarded to plaintiff's attorney via e-service for SOP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 400.00; Final Amount: 400.00; Credits: -400.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 10.00; Final Amount: 10.00; Credits: -10.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Docket Type: REQUEST TO PRODUCE; Description: To Security 1st Ins Co by Yave Yire Ent Inc et al

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Docket Type: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Description: To Security 1st Ins Co by Yave Yire Ent Inc et al

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Docket Type: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Description: To Security 1st Ins Co by Yave Yire Ent Inc et al

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: To Security 1st Ins Co

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Docket Type: COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Docket Type: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COHEN LAW GROUP is a litigant

Latest cases where YAVE YIRE ENTERPRISES INC. FORMERLY D/B/A ROOF DEPOT INC A/A/O RAMON UBLERA is a litigant

Latest cases where Security First Insurance Company is a litigant