This case was last updated from Volusia County Circuit Courts on 06/26/2020 at 13:11:53 (UTC).

WORLDWIDE ASSET PURCHASING II LLC V. CAROL POWERS

Case Summary

On 05/27/2020 WORLDWIDE ASSET PURCHASING II LLC filed an Other lawsuit against CAROL POWERS. This case was filed in Volusia County Circuit Courts, Volusia County Courthouse Deland located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is A. Christian Miller. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********CODL

  • Filing Date:

    05/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

A. Christian Miller

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

WORLDWIDE ASSET PURCHASING II LLC

RAUSCH STURM

Defendant

CAROL POWERS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MICHELLE QUILES

Rausch Sturm 5801 Ulmerton Rd Ste 201

Clearwater, FL 33760-3951

 

Court Documents

AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION

05/27/2020 : AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION

CERTIFIED COPY OF FOREIGN JUDGMENT

05/27/2020 : CERTIFIED COPY OF FOREIGN JUDGMENT

CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

05/27/2020 : CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

NOTICE TO/FOR DEFENDANT

06/02/2020 : NOTICE TO/FOR DEFENDANT

MAIL RETURNED FROM

06/10/2020 : MAIL RETURNED FROM

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/15/2020
  • Docket(#6) Docket Type: COPY OF LETTER; Description: to Michelle Quiles

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Docket Type: MAIL RETURNED FROM; Description: Carol Powers

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Docket Type: NOTICE TO/FOR DEFENDANT; Description: of Certified Copy of Foreign Judgment from the State of New York has been recorded

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 300.00; Final Amount: 300.00; Credits: -300.00; Balance: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 42.00; Final Amount: 42.00; Credits: -42.00; Balance: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 10.00; Final Amount: 10.00; Credits: -10.00; Balance: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • FinancialQuantity: 2; Unit Amount: 8.50; Final Amount: 17.00; Credits: -17.00; Balance: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 10.00; Final Amount: 10.00; Credits: -10.00; Balance: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 16.00; Final Amount: 16.00; Credits: -16.00; Balance: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Docket Type: CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE; Description: of foreign judgment by Worldwide Asset Purchasing II LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Docket Type: CERTIFIED COPY OF FOREIGN JUDGMENT; Description: agst Carol Powers,$8,022.60 total Instrument: 2020095776 Book: 7857 Page: 2378

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Docket Type: AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION; Description: of creditors by Worldwide Asset Purchasing II LLC Instrument: 2020096074 Book: 7857 Page: 3354

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WORLDWIDE ASSET PURCHASING II L L C is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Quiles, Michelle Maria