This case was last updated from Volusia County Courts on 07/07/2020 at 19:13:55 (UTC).

WISE CHIROPRACTIC PA AAO MIRIAM RODRIGUEZ V. GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 08/30/2019 WISE CHIROPRACTIC PA AAO MIRIAM RODRIGUEZ filed an Other lawsuit against GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Volusia County Courts, Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Christopher Kelly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********COCI

  • Filing Date:

    08/30/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Christopher Kelly

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SIMOES DAVILA PLLC

MIRIAM RODRIGUEZ

WISE CHIROPRACTIC PA AAO MIRIAM RODRIGUEZ

Defendant

GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KIMBERLY P SIMOES

Attorney at SIMOES DAVILA PLLC

910 Sw 1St Ave Ste 201

Ocala, FL 34474

Defendant Attorney

ASHLEY WRIGHT

Law Office Of Kelly L Wilson 1000 Legion Place Ste 850

Orlando, FL 32801

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF SERVICE

10/08/2019 : NOTICE OF SERVICE

RESPONSE BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

10/08/2019 : RESPONSE BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

09/16/2019 : REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

10/17/2019 : NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

RESPONSE BY/FOR DEFENDANT

12/17/2019 : RESPONSE BY/FOR DEFENDANT

MOTION BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

10/17/2019 : MOTION BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

10/17/2019 : REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

10/17/2019 : REQUEST BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

09/16/2019 : NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) Docket Type: REQUEST TO PRODUCE; Description: (supp) to GEICO Indemnity Company by Wise Chiropractic PA etc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) Docket Type: NOTICE OF SERVICE; Description: of Answers to Interrogs by Geico Indemnity Co

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) Docket Type: RESPONSE BY/FOR DEFENDANT; Description: Geico Indemnity Co to Request for Inspeciton of original documents

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) Docket Type: RESPONSE BY/FOR DEFENDANT; Description: Geico Indemnity Co to Request for Production

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) Docket Type: RESPONSE BY/FOR DEFENDANT; Description: GEICO Indemnity Company to req for admissions

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) Docket Type: STIPULATION AND ORDER; Description: Small Claims PT worksheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) Docket Type: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Description: of Kimberly P Simoes,Esq obo Wise Chiropractic P.A.,etc and designation of email address

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Docket Type: REQUEST BY/FOR PLAINTIFF; Description: Wise Chiropractic P.A.,etc for Inspection of original documents

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Docket Type: NOTICE BY/FOR PLAINTIFF; Description: Wise Chiropractic P.A.,etc of Rule 1.310b6 Deposition Request

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Docket Type: MOTION BY/FOR PLAINTIFF; Description: Wise Chiropractic P.A.,etc to Deposit/Retain disputed funds

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Docket Type: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Description: to GEICO Indemnity Company by Wise Chiropractic PA etc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Docket Type: REQUEST TO PRODUCE; Description: to GEICO Indemnity Company by Wise Chiropractic PA etc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Docket Type: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Description: to GEICO Indemnity Company by Wise Chiropractic PA etc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Docket Type: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Description: of Ashley Wright Esq obo GEICO Indemnity Company & designation of email

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 10.00; Final Amount: 10.00; Credits: -10.00; Balance: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 80.00; Final Amount: 80.00; Credits: -80.00; Balance: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Docket Type: PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS; Description: To GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY fwd to pltf's atty for SOP via eserve

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: to GEICO Indemnity Company

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Docket Type: COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Docket Type: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KIMBERLY P SIMOES