This case was last updated from Volusia County Courts on 09/30/2021 at 18:43:31 (UTC).

WELLS FARGO BANK NA V. UNKNOWN HEIRS OF CLAIRE SOTTOSANTI, ETC., ET AL

Case Summary

On 05/11/2015 WELLS FARGO BANK NA filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against UNKNOWN HEIRS OF CLAIRE SOTTOSANTI, ETC ,. This case was filed in Volusia County Courts, Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex located in Volusia, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Leah R. Case and Dennis Craig. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********CICI

  • Filing Date:

    05/11/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Leah R. Case

Dennis Craig

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

WELLS FARGO BANK NA

ALBERTELLI LAW

Tampa, FL 33623

Defendants

SHARI SOTTOSANTI

Naugatuck, CT 06770

JOHN G NOONAN

Orlando, FL 32801

PATRICIA A MCCARTHY

Oakville, CT 06779

LAURA K SOTTOSANTI

Prospect, FL 06712

MICHAEL P SOTTOSANTI

Prospect, CT 06712

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ACTING THROUGH

Tampa, FL 33602

1St Party Defendant

UNKNOWN HEIRS OF CLAIRE SOTTOSANTI

Not Classified By Court

UNKNOWN PARTY #1

Holly Hill, FL 32117

UNKNOWN PARTY #2

Holly Hill, FL 32117

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KATE MUNKITTRICK

Po Box 23028

Tampa, FL 33623

Defendant Attorneys

KEVIN W SHAUGHNESSY

Attorney at BAKER & HOSTETLER LLP

200 S Orange Ave Ste 2300

Orlando, FL 32802-0112

COLLEEN MURPHY DAVIS

400 N Tampa St Ste 3200

Tampa, FL 33602

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS / NAME

06/04/2019 : NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS / NAME

HEARING SHEET

03/28/2019 : HEARING SHEET

ORDER FOR DISBURSEMENT / DISTRIBUTION

03/28/2019 : ORDER FOR DISBURSEMENT / DISTRIBUTION

ORDER FOR DISBURSEMENT / DISTRIBUTION

03/28/2019 : ORDER FOR DISBURSEMENT / DISTRIBUTION

NOTICE / ORDER FOR CASE MGMT CONF.

03/04/2019 : NOTICE / ORDER FOR CASE MGMT CONF.

REQUEST FOR DISBURSEMENT / DISTRIBUTION

09/13/2016 : REQUEST FOR DISBURSEMENT / DISTRIBUTION

CONSENT BY/FOR DEFENDANT

07/05/2016 : CONSENT BY/FOR DEFENDANT

CONSENT BY/FOR DEFENDANT

07/05/2016 : CONSENT BY/FOR DEFENDANT

CONSENT BY/FOR DEFENDANT

07/05/2016 : CONSENT BY/FOR DEFENDANT

CONSENT BY/FOR DEFENDANT

07/05/2016 : CONSENT BY/FOR DEFENDANT

CONSENT BY/FOR DEFENDANT

07/05/2016 : CONSENT BY/FOR DEFENDANT

CONSENT BY/FOR DEFENDANT

07/05/2016 : CONSENT BY/FOR DEFENDANT

CONSENT BY/FOR DEFENDANT

07/05/2016 : CONSENT BY/FOR DEFENDANT

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS / NAME

06/21/2016 : NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS / NAME

ORDER FOR DISBURSEMENT / DISTRIBUTION

06/10/2016 : ORDER FOR DISBURSEMENT / DISTRIBUTION

HEARING SHEET

06/08/2016 : HEARING SHEET

MAIL RETURNED FROM

04/05/2016 : MAIL RETURNED FROM

CLAIM FOR SURPLUS FUNDS

04/04/2016 : CLAIM FOR SURPLUS FUNDS

90 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#104) Docket Type: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS / NAME; Description: Shari Sottosanti

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 15.00; Final Amount: 15.00; Credits: -15.00; Balance: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 15.00; Final Amount: 15.00; Credits: -15.00; Balance: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 15.00; Final Amount: 15.00; Credits: -15.00; Balance: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 15.00; Final Amount: 15.00; Credits: -15.00; Balance: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 15.00; Final Amount: 15.00; Credits: -15.00; Balance: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 15.00; Final Amount: 15.00; Credits: -15.00; Balance: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • DocketSession Type: Case Management Conference; Court Officer: Leah R. Case; Location: CI307, City Island Courthouse; Status: Scheduled

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#103) Docket Type: HEARING SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#102) Docket Type: ORDER FOR DISBURSEMENT / DISTRIBUTION; Description: (amd) $11,947.72 per req doc #99

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
106 More Docket Entries
  • 05/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: to Patricia A Mccarthy

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: to Michael P Sottosanti etc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: to Laura K Sottosanti etc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: to Karen S Pasquariello etc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: to John G Noonan etc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Docket Type: MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.; Description: by Wells Fargo Bank NA w/prop order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Docket Type: NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS; Description: Instrument: 2015085392 Book: 7115 Page: 3266

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Docket Type: WORKSHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Docket Type: COMPLAINT / PETITION TO FORECLOSE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Docket Type: HOME/RESIDENTIAL CS W/OUT FORM A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KEVIN SHAUGHNESSY

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DAVIS, COLLEEN MURPHY