This case was last updated from Volusia County Courts on 11/26/2022 at 23:43:52 (UTC).

WELLNESS ONE CHIROPRACTIC LLC PATIENT THERESA CONNELLY V. PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 09/13/2022 WELLNESS ONE CHIROPRACTIC LLC PATIENT THERESA CONNELLY filed an Other lawsuit against PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Volusia County Courts, Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Wesley Heidt. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********COCI

  • Filing Date:

    09/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Wesley Heidt

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

WELLNESS ONE CHIROPRACTIC LLC PATIENT THERESA CONNELLY

THERESA CONNELLY

GED LAWYERS LLP

Boca Raton, FL 33487

Defendant

PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

Tallahassee, FL 32314-6200

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHAD CHRISTENSEN

Attorney at GED LAWYERS LLP

7171 N Federal Highway

Boca Raton, FL 33487

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

09/13/2022 : COMPLAINT

REQUEST SUMMONS

09/13/2022 : REQUEST SUMMONS

PRE-TRIAL REMOTE SUMMONS ISSUED

09/14/2022 : PRE-TRIAL REMOTE SUMMONS ISSUED

RETURNED SUMMONS SERVICE ACCEPTED BY

09/27/2022 : RETURNED SUMMONS SERVICE ACCEPTED BY

NOTICE OF/FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

11/08/2022 : NOTICE OF/FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

11/08/2022 : FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/15/2023
  • DocketSession Type: Case Management Conference; Court Officer: Wesley Heidt; Location: CI-7, City Island Courthouse; Status: Cancelled

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketSession Type: Pre-Trial; Court Officer: Wesley Heidt; Location: WHZM, Zoom Meetings; Status: Cancelled

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6); Docket Type: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5); Docket Type: NOTICE OF/FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Description: w/prej by Wellness One Chiropractic LLC (Patient: Theresa Connelly) Instrument: 2022260496 Book: 8337 Page: 4572 View: 2022260496

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4); Docket Type: RETURNED SUMMONS SERVICE ACCEPTED BY; Description: CFO obo Progressive Select Ins Co

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 80.00; Final Amount: 80.00; Credits: -80.00; Balance: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 10.00; Final Amount: 10.00; Credits: -10.00; Balance: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3); Docket Type: PRE-TRIAL REMOTE SUMMONS ISSUED; Description: To PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY Frwd to Pltf's Atty via e-service for SOP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2); Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: To Progressive Select Ins Co

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1); Docket Type: COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WELLNESS ONE CHIROPRACTIC LLC A/A/O STEPHEN SPUDIS is a litigant

Latest cases where GED LAWYERS LLP is a litigant

Latest cases where PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHRISTENSEN , CHAD