This case was last updated from Volusia County Courts on 04/21/2022 at 18:23:45 (UTC).

WATER DRYOUT LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF MICHELLE F SYKES V. SOUTHERN OAK INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 04/21/2021 WATER DRYOUT LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF MICHELLE F SYKES filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against SOUTHERN OAK INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Volusia County Courts, Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Belle B. Schumann. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********COCI

  • Filing Date:

    04/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Belle B. Schumann

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DAVID LOW & ASSOCIATES P A

MICHELLE F SYKES

WATER DRYOUT LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF MICHELLE F SYKES

Defendant

SOUTHERN OAK INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JOSE CANAURA

Defendant Attorney

TIMOTHY M FLINN

 

Court Documents

RESPONSE BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

03/01/2022 : RESPONSE BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

MOTION FOR SUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT

08/26/2021 : MOTION FOR SUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT

PRE-TRIAL REMOTE SUMMONS ISSUED

04/24/2021 : PRE-TRIAL REMOTE SUMMONS ISSUED

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

04/21/2021 : STATEMENT OF CLAIM

CIVIL COVER SHEET

04/21/2021 : CIVIL COVER SHEET

NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

05/11/2021 : NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

NOTICE FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

05/11/2021 : NOTICE FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

HEARING SHEET

03/02/2022 : HEARING SHEET

PRE-TRIAL REMOTE SUMMONS ISSUED

04/27/2021 : PRE-TRIAL REMOTE SUMMONS ISSUED

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Docket Type: SUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT TO/FOR DEFENDANT; Description: Southern Oak Ins Co shall go hence w/out day and pltf shall take nothing from this action Instrument: 2022081443 Book: 8233 Page: 2206

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • DocketSession Type: Hearing; Court Officer: Visiting Judge; Location: BSZM, Zoom Meetings; Status: Scheduled; Comments: M/SJ or M/Dismiss

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Docket Type: HEARING SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Docket Type: RESPONSE BY/FOR PLAINTIFF; Description: Moisture Rid Inc etc to defs mtn for summary dispo/mtn to dismiss

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Docket Type: NOTICE OF/FOR HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Docket Type: MOTION FOR SUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT; Description: or Motion to Dismiss by Southern Oak Ins Co.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Docket Type: NOTICE FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL; Description: of atty w/in firm to Jose M Canaura Esq obo Water Dryout LLC etc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketSession Type: Pre-Trial; Court Officer: Belle B. Schumann; Location: BSZM, Zoom Meetings; Status: Scheduled

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Docket Type: MOTION TO INVOKE RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE; Description: (stip) to waive p/t & set for case management

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Docket Type: MOTION FOR EXTENSION / EXTENDING TIME; Description: to respond to complaint by Southern Oak Ins Co

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Docket Type: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Description: of Timothy M Flinn,Esq obo Southern Oak Ins. Co

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Docket Type: DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS; Description: by Timothy M Flinn,Esq

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Docket Type: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS; Description: Chief Financial Officer obo Southern Oak Insurance Company

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Docket Type: PRE-TRIAL REMOTE SUMMONS ISSUED; Description: CORRECTED To SOUTHERN OAK INSURANCE COMPANY rtn to Ptf's Atty via e service for sop

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2021
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 300.00; Final Amount: 300.00; Credits: -300.00; Balance: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2021
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 10.00; Final Amount: 10.00; Credits: -10.00; Balance: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Docket Type: PRE-TRIAL REMOTE SUMMONS ISSUED; Description: To SOUTHERN OAK INSURNACE COMPANY rtn to Ptf's Atty via e service for sop

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: Southern Oak Insurance Company

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Docket Type: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Docket Type: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less