Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Volusia County Circuit Courts on 03/04/2021 at 13:27:40 (UTC).

VELOCITY ALTERNATIVE MEDICINE CONSULTANTS INC A/A/O AMNERIS ROMAN V. STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY A FOREIGN CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 02/02/2021 VELOCITY ALTERNATIVE MEDICINE CONSULTANTS INC A/A/O AMNERIS ROMAN filed an Other lawsuit against STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY A FOREIGN CORPORATION. This case was filed in Volusia County Circuit Courts, Volusia County Courthouse Deland located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Angela A. Dempsey. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********CODL

  • Filing Date:

    02/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Volusia County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Volusia County Courthouse Deland

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Angela A. Dempsey

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

VELOCITY ALTERNATIVE MEDICINE CONSULTANTS INC A/A/O AMNERIS ROMAN

AMNERIS ROMAN

DE ARMAS & SERRANO PLLC

Defendant

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY A FOREIGN CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JONATHAN R DE ARMAS

Attorney at DE ARMAS & SERRANO LLP

222 South Westmonte Drive Suite 227

Altamonte Spring, FL 32714

 

Court Documents

RETURNED SUMMONS SERVICE ACCEPTED BY

02/15/2021 : RETURNED SUMMONS SERVICE ACCEPTED BY

PRE-TRIAL REMOTE SUMMONS ISSUED

02/10/2021 : PRE-TRIAL REMOTE SUMMONS ISSUED

COMPLAINT

02/02/2021 : COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

02/02/2021 : CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketSession Type: Case Management Conference; Court Officer: Angela A. Dempsey; Location: D-312, DeLand; Status: Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketSession Type: Pre-Trial; Court Officer: Angela A. Dempsey; Location: ADZM, Zoom Meetings; Status: Cancelled; Comments: Summons Exec

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Docket Type: RETURNED SUMMONS SERVICE ACCEPTED BY; Description: Chief Financial Officer of the State of Florida obo State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company'

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 55.00; Final Amount: 55.00; Credits: -55.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 10.00; Final Amount: 10.00; Credits: -10.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Docket Type: PRE-TRIAL REMOTE SUMMONS ISSUED; Description: To STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY A FOREIGN CORPORATION fwd to pltf atty via e-service for sop

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Docket Type: COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Docket Type: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DE ARMAS & SERRANO PLLC is a litigant

Latest cases where VELOCITY ALTERNATIVE MEDICAL CONSULTANTS INC is a litigant

Latest cases where State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JONATHAN R DE ARMAS