Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Volusia County Courts on 03/28/2021 at 13:07:10 (UTC).

VELOCITY ALTERNATIVE MEDICINE CONSULTANTS INC A A O KYLE WARREN V. STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY A FOREIGN CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 02/26/2021 VELOCITY ALTERNATIVE MEDICINE CONSULTANTS INC A A O KYLE WARREN filed an Other lawsuit against STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY A FOREIGN CORPORATION. This case was filed in Volusia County Courts, Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Wesley Heidt. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********COCI

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Volusia County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Wesley Heidt

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

KYLE WARREN

VELOCITY ALTERNATIVE MEDICINE CONSULTANTS INC A A O KYLE WARREN

DE ARMAS & SERRANO LLP

Defendant

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY A FOREIGN CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JONATHAN R DE ARMAS

Attorney at DE ARMAS & SERRANO LLP

222 South Westmonte Drive Suite 227

Altamonte Spring, FL 32714

 

Court Documents

PRE-TRIAL REMOTE SUMMONS ISSUED

03/10/2021 : PRE-TRIAL REMOTE SUMMONS ISSUED

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

02/26/2021 : STATEMENT OF CLAIM

CIVIL COVER SHEET

02/26/2021 : CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketSession Type: Case Management Conference; Court Officer: Wesley Heidt; Location: CI-7, City Island Courthouse; Status: Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketSession Type: Pre-Trial; Court Officer: Wesley Heidt; Location: WHZM, Zoom Meetings; Status: Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Docket Type: PRE-TRIAL REMOTE SUMMONS ISSUED; Description: To STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY A FOREIGN CORPORATION fwd to pltfs atty via e-service for SOP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 55.00; Final Amount: 55.00; Credits: -55.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 10.00; Final Amount: 10.00; Credits: -10.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Docket Type: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Docket Type: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DE ARMAS & SERRANO PLLC is a litigant

Latest cases where VELOCITY ALTERNATIVE MEDICAL CONSULTANTS INC is a litigant

Latest cases where State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JONATHAN R DE ARMAS