Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Volusia County Circuit Courts on 08/06/2020 at 11:47:52 (UTC).

US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION V. AARON D STRICKLAND, ET AL

Case Summary

On 01/13/2020 US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against AARON D STRICKLAND. This case was filed in Volusia County Circuit Courts, Volusia County Courthouse Deland located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Kathryn Weston. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********CIDL

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Volusia County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Volusia County Courthouse Deland

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Kathryn Weston

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ALDRIDGE | PITE LLP

US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

Defendants

CHRISTINE M STRICKLAND

AARON D STRICKLAND

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JENNIFER LAUFGAS

Attorney at ALDRIDGE PITE LLP

1615 S Congress Ave Suite 200

Delray Beach, FL 33445

 

Court Documents

TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

03/19/2020 : TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

03/19/2020 : TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

03/17/2020 : ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

03/17/2020 : ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

PROPOSED OF/FOR REPLEVIN

02/05/2020 : PROPOSED OF/FOR REPLEVIN

PROPOSED OF/FOR REPLEVIN

02/05/2020 : PROPOSED OF/FOR REPLEVIN

REQUEST SUMMONS

01/13/2020 : REQUEST SUMMONS

REQUEST SUMMONS

01/13/2020 : REQUEST SUMMONS

AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

01/13/2020 : AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

MEMORANDUM BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

01/13/2020 : MEMORANDUM BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE / VENUE

01/13/2020 : AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE / VENUE

AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE / VENUE

01/13/2020 : AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE / VENUE

COMPLAINT OF/FOR REPLEVIN

01/13/2020 : COMPLAINT OF/FOR REPLEVIN

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/13/2020 : CIVIL COVER SHEET

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/15/2020
  • DocketSession Type: Show Cause Hearing; Court Officer: Kathryn Weston; Location: DeLand; Status: Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Docket Type: TWENTY DAY SUMMONS; Description: To CHRISTINE M. STRICKLAND fwd to pltf's atty via eservice for sop

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Docket Type: TWENTY DAY SUMMONS; Description: To AARON D. STRICKLAND fwd to pltf's atty via eservice for sop

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Docket Type: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; Description: to Christine M Strickland

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Docket Type: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; Description: to Aaron D Strickland

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 85.00; Final Amount: 85.00; Credits: -85.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Docket Type: PROPOSED OF/FOR REPLEVIN; Description: order to show cause to Christine M. Strickland

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Docket Type: PROPOSED OF/FOR REPLEVIN; Description: order to show cause to Aaron D. Strickland

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 400.00; Final Amount: 400.00; Credits: -400.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • FinancialQuantity: 2; Unit Amount: 10.00; Final Amount: 20.00; Credits: -20.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: to Christine M. Strickland

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: to Aaron D. Strickland

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Docket Type: AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION BY/FOR PLAINTIFF; Description: U.S. Bank National Association of pltf's motion for writ of replevin

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Docket Type: MEMORANDUM BY/FOR PLAINTIFF; Description: of points and authorities in support of pltf's application for writ of replevin

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Docket Type: AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE / VENUE; Description: as to Aaron D. Strickland

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Docket Type: AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE / VENUE; Description: as to Christine M. Strickland

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Docket Type: COMPLAINT OF/FOR REPLEVIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Docket Type: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Aldridge Pite, LLP is a litigant

Latest cases where U.S. Bank, N.A. as Trustee for the RMAC Trust, Series 2016-CTT is a litigant