This case was last updated from Volusia County Courts on 03/10/2023 at 02:20:09 (UTC).

UNIFUND CCR LLC V. TRENTON STEWARD

Case Summary

On 12/29/2022 UNIFUND CCR LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against TRENTON STEWARD. This case was filed in Volusia County Courts, Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Wesley Heidt. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********COCI

  • Filing Date:

    12/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Wesley Heidt

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

UNIFUND CCR LLC

HUNT & KAHN PA

Margate, FL 33093-4788

Defendant

TRENTON STEWARD

Daytona Beach, FL 32114

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JEFFREY L KAHN

Po Box 934788

Margate, FL 33093-4788

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

12/29/2022 : CIVIL COVER SHEET

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

12/29/2022 : STATEMENT OF CLAIM

REQUEST SUMMONS

12/29/2022 : REQUEST SUMMONS

MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

12/29/2022 : MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

PRE-TRIAL REMOTE SUMMONS ISSUED

01/03/2023 : PRE-TRIAL REMOTE SUMMONS ISSUED

ORDER TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

01/11/2023 : ORDER TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED

01/26/2023 : RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/07/2023
  • DocketSession Type: Pre-Trial; Court Officer: Wesley Heidt; Location: WHZM, Zoom Meetings; Status: Scheduled

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8); Docket Type: RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED; Description: Trenton Steward

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7); Docket Type: ORDER TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 175.00; Final Amount: 175.00; Credits: -175.00; Balance: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 10.00; Final Amount: 10.00; Credits: -10.00; Balance: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6); Docket Type: PRE-TRIAL REMOTE SUMMONS ISSUED; Description: To TRENTON STEWARD rtn to atty via e-service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5); Docket Type: MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.; Description: by Unifund CCR LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • Docket(#4); Docket Type: NOTICE FOR REDACTION/CONFIDENTIALITY; Description: by Unifund CCR LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3); Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: as to Trenton Steward

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2); Docket Type: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1); Docket Type: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less