This case was last updated from Volusia County Courts on 03/29/2020 at 00:16:50 (UTC).

UNIFUND CCR LLC V. LAUREN JABALY

Case Summary

On 02/03/2020 UNIFUND CCR LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against LAUREN JABALY. This case was filed in Volusia County Courts, Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Christopher Kelly. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********COCI

  • Filing Date:

    02/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Volusia County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Christopher Kelly

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

UNIFUND CCR LLC

Defendant

LAUREN JABALY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DERYL G HUNT

Attorney at HUNT & KAHN P A

P O Box 934788

Margate, FL 33093-4788

 

Court Documents

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

03/24/2020 : FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

ORDER APPROVING / AFFIRMING / CONFIRMING STIPULATION or SETTLEMENT

03/24/2020 : ORDER APPROVING / AFFIRMING / CONFIRMING STIPULATION or SETTLEMENT

STIPULATION FOR/OF PAYMENT(S)

03/24/2020 : STIPULATION FOR/OF PAYMENT(S)

RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED

03/17/2020 : RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED

NOTICE OF/FOR NEW COURT DATE

03/17/2020 : NOTICE OF/FOR NEW COURT DATE

ORDER TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

02/13/2020 : ORDER TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS

02/05/2020 : PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS

REQUEST SUMMONS

02/03/2020 : REQUEST SUMMONS

MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

02/03/2020 : MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

02/03/2020 : STATEMENT OF CLAIM

CIVIL COVER SHEET

02/03/2020 : CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/13/2020
  • DocketSession Type: Pre-Trial; Court Officer: Christopher Kelly; Location: CI-7, City Island Courthouse; Status: Cancelled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • DocketSession Type: Pre-Trial; Court Officer: Christopher Kelly; Location: CI-7, City Island Courthouse; Status: Cancelled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Docket Type: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Docket Type: ORDER APPROVING / AFFIRMING / CONFIRMING STIPULATION or SETTLEMENT; Description: Instrument: 2020061210 Book: 7833 Page: 2366

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Docket Type: STIPULATION FOR/OF PAYMENT(S); Description: agst Lauren Jabaly Instrument: 2020061208 Book: 7833 Page: 2333

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Docket Type: RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED; Description: Lauren Jabaly

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Docket Type: NOTICE OF/FOR NEW COURT DATE; Description: Notice to parties that the hearing(s) previously scheduled on 3/27/2020 at 09:00a were rescheduled to 5/13/2020 at 09:00a in City Island Courthouse in COURTROOM 7, 3rd Floor, VOLUSIA COUNTY COURTHOUSE ANNEX with Kelly, Christopher.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Docket Type: ORDER TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 175.00; Final Amount: 175.00; Credits: -175.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 10.00; Final Amount: 10.00; Credits: -10.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Docket Type: PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS; Description: To LAUREN JABALY fwd to pltfs atty & proc serv(Max) via e-service for sop

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: to Lauren Jabaly

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Docket Type: MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.; Description: by Unifund CCR LLC w/no prop order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • Docket(#3) Docket Type: NOTICE FOR REDACTION/CONFIDENTIALITY; Description: by Unifund CCR LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Docket Type: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Docket Type: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less