This case was last updated from Volusia County Circuit Courts on 07/02/2021 at 18:34:50 (UTC).

UMB BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION NOT IN ITS INDIVIDUAL CAPACITY BUT SOLELY AS LEGAL TITLE, ETC. V. UNKNOWN HEIRS ETC OF JASPER LOWERY A K A JASPER LOWERY JR DECEASED, ET AL

Case Summary

On 06/02/2021 UMB BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION NOT IN ITS INDIVIDUAL CAPACITY BUT SOLELY AS LEGAL TITLE, ETC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against UNKNOWN HEIRS ETC OF JASPER LOWERY A K A JASPER LOWERY JR DECEASED. This case was filed in Volusia County Circuit Courts, Volusia County Courthouse Deland located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Randell H. Rowe, III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********CIDL

  • Filing Date:

    06/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Randell H. Rowe, III

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

UMB BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION NOT IN ITS INDIVIDUAL CAPACITY BUT SOLELY AS LEGAL TITLE

MCMICHAEL TAYLOR GRAY LLC

Defendants

UNKNOWN HEIRS ETC OF JASPER LOWERY A K A JASPER LOWERY JR DECEASED

JASPER LOWERY

JASPER LOWERY JR

TERRANCE CHERRY

KENDALL CHERRY

COUNTY OF VOLUSIA FLORIDA

Not Classified By Court

UNKNOWN TENANT 1 THE NAMES BEING FICTITIOUS TO ACCOUNT FOR PARTIES IN POSSESSION

UNKNOWN TENANT 2 THE NAMES BEING FICTITIOUS TO ACCOUNT FOR PARTIES IN POSSESSION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHRISTOPHER T PECK

Attorney at MCMICHAEL TAYLOR GRAY LLC

3550 Engineering Drive Ste 260

Peachtree Corners, GA 30092

 

Court Documents

ORDER TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

06/23/2021 : ORDER TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

ORDER TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

06/16/2021 : ORDER TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

06/16/2021 : MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

06/04/2021 : TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

06/04/2021 : TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

THIRTY DAY SUMMONS

06/04/2021 : THIRTY DAY SUMMONS

TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

06/04/2021 : TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

06/04/2021 : TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

06/04/2021 : TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

REQUEST SUMMONS

06/02/2021 : REQUEST SUMMONS

REQUEST SUMMONS

06/02/2021 : REQUEST SUMMONS

REQUEST SUMMONS

06/02/2021 : REQUEST SUMMONS

REQUEST SUMMONS

06/02/2021 : REQUEST SUMMONS

MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

06/02/2021 : MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

06/02/2021 : NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

WORKSHEET

06/02/2021 : WORKSHEET

COMPLAINT / PETITION TO FORECLOSE

06/02/2021 : COMPLAINT / PETITION TO FORECLOSE

CIVIL COVER SHEET

06/02/2021 : CIVIL COVER SHEET

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) Docket Type: ORDER TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) Docket Type: ORDER TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Docket Type: MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.; Description: by UMB Bank etc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Docket Type: TWENTY DAY SUMMONS; Description: To UNKNOWN TENANT 2, THE NAMES BEING FICTITIOUS TO ACCOUNT FOR PARTIES IN POSSESSION fwd to pltf's atty & process server (Max) via eservice for SOP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Docket Type: TWENTY DAY SUMMONS; Description: To UNKNOWN TENANT 1, THE NAMES BEING FICTITIOUS TO ACCOUNT FOR PARTIES IN POSSESSION fwd to pltf's atty & process server (Max) via eservice for SOP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Docket Type: THIRTY DAY SUMMONS; Description: To COUNTY OF VOLUSIA, FLORIDA fwd to pltf's atty & process server (Max) via eservice for SOP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Docket Type: TWENTY DAY SUMMONS; Description: To KENDALL CHERRY fwd to pltf's atty & process server (Max) via eservice for SOP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Docket Type: TWENTY DAY SUMMONS; Description: To TERRANCE CHERRY fwd to pltf's atty & process server (Max) via eservice for SOP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Docket Type: TWENTY DAY SUMMONS; Description: To THE UNKNOWN HEIRS ETC CLAIMING BY, THROUGH, UNDER, OR AGAINST JASPER LOWERY A/K/A JASPER LOWERY JR., DECEASED fwd to pltf's atty & process server (Max) via eservice for SOP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 905.00; Final Amount: 905.00; Credits: -905.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: to Unknown Tenant 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: to Unknown Tenant 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: to The Unknown Heirs etc claiming by, through, under, or against Jasper Lowery etc, deceased

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: to Terrance Cherry

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: to Kendall Cherry

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Docket Type: MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.; Description: by UMB Bank, National Association etc w/o prop order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Docket Type: NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS; Description: Instrument: 2021130331 Book: 8059 Page: 3366

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Docket Type: WORKSHEET; Description: Real Property

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Docket Type: COMPLAINT / PETITION TO FORECLOSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Docket Type: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where McMichael Taylor Gray, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where UMB BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION NOT IN ITS INDIVIDUAL CAPACITY BUT SOLELY AS LEGAL TITLE TRUSTEE OF TOCU TITLE TRUST 2017-1 is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PECK, CHRISTOPHER TADEUS