This case was last updated from Volusia County Circuit Courts on 10/15/2022 at 22:48:14 (UTC).

U S BANK TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIATION NOT IN ITS INDIVIDUAL CAPACITY BUT SOLELY AS OWNER TRUSTEE, ETC. V. KARL W ANCKARSTROM BOHM, ET AL

Case Summary

On 08/19/2022 U S BANK TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIATION NOT IN ITS INDIVIDUAL CAPACITY BUT SOLELY AS OWNER TRUSTEE, ETC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against KARL W ANCKARSTROM BOHM,. This case was filed in Volusia County Circuit Courts, Volusia County Courthouse Deland located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Randell H. Rowe, III. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********CIDL

  • Filing Date:

    08/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Randell H. Rowe, III

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

U S BANK TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIATION NOT IN ITS INDIVIDUAL CAPACITY BUT SOLELY AS OWNER TRUSTEE

RCF 2 ACQUISITION TRUST

ROBERTSON ANSCHUTZ SCHNEID CRANE & PARTNERS PLLC

Boca Raton, FL 33487

Defendants

KARL W ANCKARSTROM BOHM

Deltona, FL 32738

MARIANNE ANCKARSTROM BOHM

Deltona, FL 32738

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CAN GUNER

Attorney at ROBERTSON ANSCHUTZ SCHNEID CRANE & PARTNERS PLLC

6409 Congress Ave Ste 100

Boca Raton, FL 33487

 

Court Documents

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

09/28/2022 : FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

NOTICE OF/FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

09/28/2022 : NOTICE OF/FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED

09/28/2022 : RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED

ANSWER BY/FOR DEFENDANT

10/06/2022 : ANSWER BY/FOR DEFENDANT

ORDER TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

09/13/2022 : ORDER TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

09/01/2022 : CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

08/29/2022 : CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

08/25/2022 : NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

08/25/2022 : TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

08/25/2022 : TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

REQUEST SUMMONS

08/19/2022 : REQUEST SUMMONS

REQUEST SUMMONS

08/19/2022 : REQUEST SUMMONS

MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

08/19/2022 : MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

CERTIFICATE BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

08/19/2022 : CERTIFICATE BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

08/19/2022 : CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

WORKSHEET

08/19/2022 : WORKSHEET

COMPLAINT / PETITION TO FORECLOSE

08/19/2022 : COMPLAINT / PETITION TO FORECLOSE

CIVIL COVER SHEET

08/19/2022 : CIVIL COVER SHEET

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18); Docket Type: ANSWER BY/FOR DEFENDANT; Description: Karl W Anckarstrom-Bohm w/attd

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17); Docket Type: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16); Docket Type: NOTICE OF/FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Description: w/out prej by US Bank Trust Nat'l Assoc etc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15); Docket Type: RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED; Description: Karl W Anckarstrom-Bohm

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14); Docket Type: ORDER TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13); Docket Type: CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE; Description: of CMO by US Bank Trust National Association etc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12); Docket Type: CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE; Description: of CMO by US Bank Trust National Association etc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 905.00; Final Amount: 905.00; Credits: -905.00; Balance: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • FinancialQuantity: 2; Unit Amount: 10.00; Final Amount: 20.00; Credits: -20.00; Balance: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 5.00; Final Amount: 5.00; Credits: -5.00; Balance: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 08/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10); Docket Type: TWENTY DAY SUMMONS; Description: To MARIANNE ANCKARSTROM-BOHM Frwd to Pltf's Atty & Proc Server (Max) via e-service for SOP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9); Docket Type: TWENTY DAY SUMMONS; Description: To KARL W. ANCKARSTROM-BOHM Frwd to Pltf's Atty & Proc Server (Max) via e-service for SOP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8); Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: To Marianne Anckarstrom-Bohm

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7); Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: To Karl W Anckarstrom-Bohm

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6); Docket Type: MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.; Description: By US Bank Trust Nat'l Assn etc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5); Docket Type: CERTIFICATE BY/FOR PLAINTIFF; Description: US Bank Trust Nat'l Assn etc of Possession

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4); Docket Type: CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3); Docket Type: WORKSHEET; Description: Real Property

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2); Docket Type: COMPLAINT / PETITION TO FORECLOSE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1); Docket Type: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RCF 2 ACQUISITION TRUST is a litigant

Latest cases where ROBERTSON ANSCHUTZ SCHNEID CRANE & PARTNERS PLLC is a litigant

Latest cases where U.S. Bank Trust, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GUNER, CAN, ESQ.