This case was last updated from Volusia County Courts on 01/07/2023 at 11:28:21 (UTC).

U S BANK TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIATION NOT IN ITS INDIVIDUAL CAPACITY BUT SOLELY AS OWNER TRUSTEE, ETC. V. DEBRA TODMAN, ETC., ET AL

Case Summary

On 09/27/2022 U S BANK TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIATION NOT IN ITS INDIVIDUAL CAPACITY BUT SOLELY AS OWNER TRUSTEE, ETC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against DEBRA TODMAN, ETC ,. This case was filed in Volusia County Courts, Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Mary G. Jolley. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********CICI

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Mary G. Jolley

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

U S BANK TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIATION NOT IN ITS INDIVIDUAL CAPACITY BUT SOLELY AS OWNER TRUSTEE

RCF 2 ACQUISITION TRUST

ROBERTSON ANSCHUTZ SCHNEID CRANE & PARTNERS PLLC

Boca Raton, FL 33487

Defendants

DEBRA TODMAN

Daytona Beach, FL 32114

DEBRA E TODMAN

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF DEBRA TODMAN A K A DEBRA E TODMAN

Daytona Beach, FL 32114

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CAN GUNER

Attorney at ROBERTSON ANSCHUTZ SCHNEID CRANE & PARTNERS PLLC

6409 Congress Ave Ste 100

Boca Raton, FL 33487

Defendant Attorney

KEVIN KYLE

Attorney at KYLE & KYLE LAW

924 N Magnolia Ave Ste 202 Unit #5144

Orlando, FL 32803

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF SERVICE

12/16/2022 : NOTICE OF SERVICE

ORDER FOR EXTENSION / EXTENDING TIME

12/13/2022 : ORDER FOR EXTENSION / EXTENDING TIME

RETURNED SUMMONS UNEXECUTED

12/06/2022 : RETURNED SUMMONS UNEXECUTED

RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED

12/06/2022 : RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED

MOTION FOR EXTENSION / EXTENDING TIME

12/05/2022 : MOTION FOR EXTENSION / EXTENDING TIME

NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY

11/29/2022 : NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY

RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED

11/23/2022 : RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED

RETURNED SUMMONS UNEXECUTED

11/23/2022 : RETURNED SUMMONS UNEXECUTED

NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

11/04/2022 : NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

REQUEST SUMMONS

09/27/2022 : REQUEST SUMMONS

REQUEST SUMMONS

09/27/2022 : REQUEST SUMMONS

MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

09/27/2022 : MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

CERTIFICATE BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

09/27/2022 : CERTIFICATE BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

09/27/2022 : CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

09/27/2022 : NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

WORKSHEET

09/27/2022 : WORKSHEET

COMPLAINT / PETITION TO FORECLOSE

09/27/2022 : COMPLAINT / PETITION TO FORECLOSE

CIVIL COVER SHEET

09/27/2022 : CIVIL COVER SHEET

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23); Docket Type: NOTICE OF SERVICE; Description: of attd copy of Order on Dfnt's Mtn for Extension of Time to Respond to Verified Complaint to Foreclose Mortgage by US Bank Trust National Assoc etc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22); Docket Type: ORDER FOR EXTENSION / EXTENDING TIME; Description: for Dfnt's to respond to complaint to foreclosure mortgage

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21); Docket Type: RETURNED SUMMONS UNEXECUTED; Description: Unknown Spouse of Debra Todman etc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20); Docket Type: RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED; Description: Debra Todman etc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19); Docket Type: MOTION FOR EXTENSION / EXTENDING TIME; Description: to respond to complaint by Debra Todman

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18); Docket Type: NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY; Description: Unkn Spouse of Debra Todman etc Instrument: 2022272291 Book: 8344 Page: 1017 View: 2022272291

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17); Docket Type: RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED; Description: Debra Todman etc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16); Docket Type: RETURNED SUMMONS UNEXECUTED; Description: Unkn Spouse of Debra Todman etc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15); Docket Type: NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY; Description: Kevin J Kyle

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14); Docket Type: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Description: Kevin J Kyle obo Debra Todman w/designation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 10/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10); Docket Type: TWENTY DAY SUMMONS; Description: To DEBRA TODMAN A/K/A DEBRA E. TODMAN Frwd to Pltf's Atty & Proc Server (Max) via e-service for SOP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9); Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: To Unknown Spouse of Debra Todman etc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8); Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: To Debra Todman etc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7); Docket Type: MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.; Description: By US Bank Trust Nat'l Assn etc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6); Docket Type: CERTIFICATE BY/FOR PLAINTIFF; Description: US Bank Trust Nat'l Assn etc of Note Possession

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5); Docket Type: CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4); Docket Type: NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS; Description: Instrument: 2022226517 Book: 8319 Page: 329 View: 2022226517

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3); Docket Type: WORKSHEET; Description: Real Property

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2); Docket Type: COMPLAINT / PETITION TO FORECLOSE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1); Docket Type: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RCF 2 ACQUISITION TRUST is a litigant

Latest cases where ROBERTSON ANSCHUTZ SCHNEID CRANE & PARTNERS PLLC is a litigant

Latest cases where U.S. Bank Trust, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KYLE, KEVIN