This case was last updated from Volusia County Circuit Courts on 01/22/2023 at 20:29:20 (UTC).

U S BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION NOT IN ITS INDIVIDUAL CAPACITY BUT SOLELY AS TRUSTEE FOR THE V. WINSTON LLOYD, ETC., ET AL

Case Summary

On 07/25/2022 U S BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION NOT IN ITS INDIVIDUAL CAPACITY BUT SOLELY AS TRUSTEE FOR THE filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against WINSTON LLOYD, ETC ,. This case was filed in Volusia County Circuit Courts, Volusia County Courthouse Deland located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Michael S. Orfinger. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********CIDL

  • Filing Date:

    07/25/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Michael S. Orfinger

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

U S BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION NOT IN ITS INDIVIDUAL CAPACITY BUT SOLELY AS TRUSTEE FOR THE

ADJUSTABLE RATE MORTGAGE TRUST 2005-11 ADJUSTABLE RATE MORTGAGE-BACKED PASSTHROUGH CERTIFICATES

LOGS LEGAL GROUP LLP

Boca Raton, FL 33431

Defendants

WINSTON LLOYD

Apopka, FL 32712

ALISON WILLIAMS LLOYD

Apopka, FL 32712

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF WINSTON LLOYD

Apopka, FL 32712

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF ALISON WILLIAMS LLOYD

Apopka, FL 32712

EDNA M FORREST

Maitland, FL 32725

EDNA FORREST

MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTATION SYSTEMS INC ACTING SOLELY AS NOMINEE FOR COUNTRYWIDE BANK A

Plantation, FL 33324

COUNTRYWIDE BANK

TREASURY BANK N A

UNKNOWN PARTIES IN POSSESSION #1

Deltona, FL 32725

UNKNOWN PARTIES IN POSSESSION #2

Deltona, FL 32725

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MATTHEW I FLICKER

1505 N Florida Ave

Tampa, FL 33602

Defendant Attorney

ANTHONY N LEGENDRE II

Po Box 948599

Maitland, FL 32794-8599

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY

10/07/2022 : NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY

PREVIOUSLY FILED THROUGH PORTAL

10/07/2022 : PREVIOUSLY FILED THROUGH PORTAL

AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE / VENUE

10/06/2022 : AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE / VENUE

RETURNED SUMMONS UNEXECUTED

09/09/2022 : RETURNED SUMMONS UNEXECUTED

RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED

09/08/2022 : RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED

RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED

09/08/2022 : RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED

RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED

09/08/2022 : RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED

RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED

09/08/2022 : RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED

RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED

09/08/2022 : RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED

REQUEST BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

07/25/2022 : REQUEST BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

NOTE, CONTRACT, OR MORTGAGE

07/25/2022 : NOTE, CONTRACT, OR MORTGAGE

CERTIFICATE BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

07/25/2022 : CERTIFICATE BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

NOTICE OF FILING

07/25/2022 : NOTICE OF FILING

CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

07/25/2022 : CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

07/25/2022 : NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

WORKSHEET

07/25/2022 : WORKSHEET

COMPLAINT / PETITION TO FORECLOSE

07/25/2022 : COMPLAINT / PETITION TO FORECLOSE

CIVIL COVER SHEET

07/25/2022 : CIVIL COVER SHEET

31 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#43); Docket Type: NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY; Description: as to Unk Spouse of Winston Lloyd,etc., all Unknown Parties,etc.,Unk Spouse of Alison Williams Lloyd,etc., All Unk Parties,etc and Unk Parites in Possession #2 Instrument: 2022236197 Book: 8324 Page: 2711 View: 2022236197

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42); Docket Type: PREVIOUSLY FILED THROUGH PORTAL; Description: Affidavit of Military Service as to Winston Lloyd,etc Alison Williams Lloyd,Edna Forrest, and Chris Abeland

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#41); Docket Type: AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE / VENUE; Description: as to Winston Lloyd,etc Alison Williams Lloyd,Edna Forrest, and Chris Abeland

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40); Docket Type: RETURNED SUMMONS UNEXECUTED; Description: Unk spouse of Alison Williams-Lloyd

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39); Docket Type: RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED; Description: Winston Lloyd etc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38); Docket Type: RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED; Description: Edna M Forrest etc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37); Docket Type: RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED; Description: MERS as nominee for Countrywide Bank etc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36); Docket Type: RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED; Description: Alison Williams-Lloyd etc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35); Docket Type: RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED; Description: Unk parties in poss #1 nka Chris Abeland

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34); Docket Type: RETURNED SUMMONS UNEXECUTED; Description: Unk spouse of Winston Lloyd

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
29 More Docket Entries
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10); Docket Type: MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.; Description: By US Bank Nat'l Assn etc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9); Docket Type: REQUEST BY/FOR PLAINTIFF; Description: US Bank Nat'l Assn etc for Change of Address

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8); Docket Type: NOTE, CONTRACT, OR MORTGAGE; Description: E-filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7); Docket Type: CERTIFICATE BY/FOR PLAINTIFF; Description: US Bank Nat'l Assn etc of Possession of Original Note

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6); Docket Type: NOTICE OF FILING; Description: Cert of Possession of Original Note by US Bank Nat'l Assn etc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5); Docket Type: CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4); Docket Type: NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS; Description: Instrument: 2022177562 Book: 8290 Page: 2505 View: 2022177562

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3); Docket Type: WORKSHEET; Description: Real Property

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2); Docket Type: COMPLAINT / PETITION TO FORECLOSE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1); Docket Type: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ADJUSTABLE RATE MORTGAGE TRUST 2005-11 ADJUSTABLE RATE MORTGAGE-BACKED PASSTHROUGH CERTIFICATES is a litigant

Latest cases where LOGS LEGAL GROUP LLP is a litigant

Latest cases where TREASURY BANK A DIVISION OF COUNTYWIDE BANK N A is a litigant

Latest cases where U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, NOT IN ITS INDIVIDUAL CAPACITY BUT SOLELY is a litigant