This case was last updated from Volusia County Circuit Courts on 05/20/2023 at 02:06:20 (UTC).

TRUVIEW MOLD LLC A A O OLGA I ROBLEDO VARGAS & MARIA A ORTIZ V. FLORIDA INSURANCE GUARANTY ASSOCIATION F K A AVATAR PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 02/13/2023 TRUVIEW MOLD LLC A A O OLGA I ROBLEDO VARGAS MARIA A ORTIZ filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against FLORIDA INSURANCE GUARANTY ASSOCIATION F K A AVATAR PROPERTY CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Volusia County Circuit Courts, Volusia County Courthouse Deland located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Rachel D. Myers. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********CODL

  • Filing Date:

    02/13/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Rachel D. Myers

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

TRUVIEW MOLD LLC A A O OLGA I ROBLEDO VARGAS & MARIA A ORTIZ

OLGA I ROBLEDO VARGAS

MARIA A ORTIZ

YOUR INSURANCE ATTORNEY PLLC

Defendants

FLORIDA INSURANCE GUARANTY ASSOCIATION F K A AVATAR PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

AVATAR PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

J MICHAEL KELLY

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

02/13/2023 : CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

02/13/2023 : COMPLAINT

CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

02/13/2023 : CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

INTERROGATORIES

02/13/2023 : INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

02/13/2023 : REQUEST TO PRODUCE

LETTER(S)

02/13/2023 : LETTER(S)

TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

02/17/2023 : TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED

02/28/2023 : RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED

PREVIOUSLY FILED THROUGH PORTAL

02/28/2023 : PREVIOUSLY FILED THROUGH PORTAL

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

04/03/2023 : NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

MOTION FOR EXTENSION / EXTENDING TIME

04/15/2023 : MOTION FOR EXTENSION / EXTENDING TIME

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/10/2023
  • DocketSession Type: Pre-Trial; Court Officer: Rachel D. Myers; Location: 1, DeLand; Status: Cancelled

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11); Docket Type: MOTION FOR EXTENSION / EXTENDING TIME; Description: to respond to the complaint and discovery by Florida Insurance Guaranty Association,etc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10); Docket Type: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Description: of J Michael Kelly,Esq obo Truviewmold LLC.,etc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9); Docket Type: PREVIOUSLY FILED THROUGH PORTAL; Description: return of service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8); Docket Type: RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED; Description: Florida Insurance Guaranty Association fka Avatar Property & Casualty Insurance Company Inc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 175.00; Final Amount: 175.00; Credits: -175.00; Balance: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 10.00; Final Amount: 10.00; Credits: -10.00; Balance: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7); Docket Type: TWENTY DAY SUMMONS; Description: To FLORIDA INSURANCE GUARANTY ASSOCIATION F/K/A AVATAR PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY forwarded to plaintiff's attorney via e-service for SOP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6); Docket Type: LETTER(S); Description: to Florida Insurance Guaranty Assn f/k/a Avatar Property & Casualty Insurance Company by Truview Mold LLC a/a/o Olga I Robledo Vargas & Maria A Ortiz to provide dates for deposition of corporate Representative

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5); Docket Type: REQUEST TO PRODUCE; Description: to Florida Insurance Guaranty Assn f/k/a Avatar Property & Casualty Insurance Company by Truview Mold LLC a/a/o Olga I Robledo Vargas & Maria A Ortiz

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4); Docket Type: INTERROGATORIES; Description: Plaintiff's First Set to Florida Insurance Guaranty Assn f/k/a Avatar Property & Casualty Insurance Company

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3); Docket Type: CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2); Docket Type: COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1); Docket Type: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less