This case was last updated from Volusia County Circuit Courts on 05/23/2023 at 03:23:14 (UTC).

TRUVIEW MOLD LLC A A O OLGA I ROBLEDO VARGAS & MARIA A ORTIZ V. FLORIDA INSURANCE GUARANTY ASSOCIATION F K A AVATAR PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 02/13/2023 TRUVIEW MOLD LLC A A O OLGA I ROBLEDO VARGAS MARIA A ORTIZ filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against FLORIDA INSURANCE GUARANTY ASSOCIATION F K A AVATAR PROPERTY CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Volusia County Circuit Courts, Volusia County Courthouse Deland located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Rachel D. Myers. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********CODL

  • Filing Date:

    02/13/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Rachel D. Myers

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

TRUVIEW MOLD LLC A A O OLGA I ROBLEDO VARGAS & MARIA A ORTIZ

OLGA I ROBLEDO VARGAS

MARIA A ORTIZ

YOUR INSURANCE ATTORNEY PLLC

Defendants

FLORIDA INSURANCE GUARANTY ASSOCIATION F K A AVATAR PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

AVATAR PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JOSHUA LOPEZ

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

02/13/2023 : CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

02/13/2023 : COMPLAINT

CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

02/13/2023 : CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

02/13/2023 : NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

02/13/2023 : REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

02/13/2023 : REQUEST BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS

02/18/2023 : PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS

MOTION FOR EXTENSION / EXTENDING TIME

03/15/2023 : MOTION FOR EXTENSION / EXTENDING TIME

MOTION FOR EXTENSION / EXTENDING TIME

04/14/2023 : MOTION FOR EXTENSION / EXTENDING TIME

COURT NOTES

05/10/2023 : COURT NOTES

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/10/2023
  • DocketSession Type: Pre-Trial; Court Officer: Rachel D. Myers; Location: 1, DeLand; Status: Scheduled

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10); Docket Type: COURT NOTES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9); Docket Type: MOTION FOR EXTENSION / EXTENDING TIME; Description: to respond to the complaint & discovery by Florida Insurance Guaranty Association,etc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8); Docket Type: MOTION FOR EXTENSION / EXTENDING TIME; Description: to respond to complaint by Florida Insurance Guaranty Association

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2023
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 175.00; Final Amount: 175.00; Credits: -175.00; Balance: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2023
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 10.00; Final Amount: 10.00; Credits: -10.00; Balance: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7); Docket Type: PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS; Description: To FLORIDA INSURANCE GUARANTY ASSOCIATION F/K/A AVATAR PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY Fwd to pltf atty via e-service for SOP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6); Docket Type: REQUEST BY/FOR PLAINTIFF; Description: Truview Mold LLC etc for deposition dates

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5); Docket Type: REQUEST TO PRODUCE; Description: to Florida Ins Guaranty Assn etc by Truview Mold LLC etc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4); Docket Type: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Description: to Florida Ins Guaranty Assn etc by Truview Mold LLC etc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3); Docket Type: CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2); Docket Type: COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1); Docket Type: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less