This case was last updated from Volusia County Courts on 12/19/2022 at 15:26:38 (UTC).

TRAILS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC A FLORIDA NON-PROFIT CORPORATION V. PETER CHIARAVALLE, ET AL

Case Summary

On 02/23/2022 TRAILS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC A FLORIDA NON-PROFIT CORPORATION filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against PETER CHIARAVALLE,. This case was filed in Volusia County Courts, Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Dennis Craig. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********CICI

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Dennis Craig

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

TRAILS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC A FLORIDA NON-PROFIT CORPORATION

FLORIDA COMMUNITY LAW GROUP P L

Defendants

PETER CHIARAVALLE

PATRICIA CHIARAVALLE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JARED BLOCK

Defendant Attorney

DAVID L FERGUSON

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT / PETITION TO FORECLOSE ON LIEN

02/23/2022 : COMPLAINT / PETITION TO FORECLOSE ON LIEN

WORKSHEET

02/23/2022 : WORKSHEET

NOTICE OF/FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

11/07/2022 : NOTICE OF/FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

NOTICE / ORDER OF CANCELING OF/FOR HEARING

07/26/2022 : NOTICE / ORDER OF CANCELING OF/FOR HEARING

MOTION TO CONTINUE / CONTINUING

07/26/2022 : MOTION TO CONTINUE / CONTINUING

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

07/11/2022 : NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF/FOR HEARING

06/23/2022 : NOTICE OF/FOR HEARING

MOTION FOR SUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT

06/13/2022 : MOTION FOR SUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT

DEFAULT

05/05/2022 : DEFAULT

DEFAULT

05/05/2022 : DEFAULT

MOTION OF/FOR DEFAULT

04/27/2022 : MOTION OF/FOR DEFAULT

MOTION OF/FOR DEFAULT

04/27/2022 : MOTION OF/FOR DEFAULT

AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE / VENUE

04/27/2022 : AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE / VENUE

AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE / VENUE

04/27/2022 : AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE / VENUE

RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED

04/06/2022 : RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED

RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED

04/06/2022 : RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED

ORDER TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

03/01/2022 : ORDER TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

02/23/2022 : TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24); Docket Type: NOTICE OF/FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Description: w/prej by The Trails Homeowners Assoc Inc Instrument: 2022258906 Book: 8336 Page: 4946 View: 2022258906

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketSession Type: Hearing; Court Officer: Dennis Craig; Location: Zoom Meetings; Status: Cancelled; Comments: pltfs mtn sfj

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23); Docket Type: NOTICE / ORDER OF CANCELING OF/FOR HEARING; Description: by The Trails Homeowners Assoc Inc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22); Docket Type: MOTION TO CONTINUE / CONTINUING; Description: of 07/27/2022 hrg by Patricia Chiaravalle

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21); Docket Type: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Description: David L Ferguson obo Peter and Patricia Chiaravalle

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20); Docket Type: NOTICE OF/FOR HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19); Docket Type: MOTION FOR SUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT; Description: by The Trails Homeowners Association Inc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18); Docket Type: DEFAULT; Description: as to Peter Chiaravalle

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17); Docket Type: DEFAULT; Description: as to Patricia Chiaravalle

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16); Docket Type: MOTION OF/FOR DEFAULT; Description: as to Peter Chiaravalle w/prop default

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 02/23/2022
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 5.00; Final Amount: 5.00; Credits: -5.00; Balance: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9); Docket Type: TWENTY DAY SUMMONS; Description: To PATRICIA CHIARAVALLE w/ CMO att'd fwd to pltf's atty & process server (Max) via eservice for SOP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8); Docket Type: TWENTY DAY SUMMONS; Description: To PETER CHIARAVALLE w/ CMO att'd fwd to pltf's atty & process server (Max) via eservice for SOP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7); Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: to Peter Chiaravalle

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6); Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: to Patricia Chiaravalle

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5); Docket Type: MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.; Description: by The Trails Homeowners Association, Inc. w/ prop order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4); Docket Type: NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS; Description: Instrument: 2022043023 Book: 8208 Page: 1951 View: 2022043023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3); Docket Type: WORKSHEET; Description: Real Property

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2); Docket Type: COMPLAINT / PETITION TO FORECLOSE ON LIEN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1); Docket Type: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less