This case was last updated from Volusia County Courts on 12/23/2022 at 02:04:50 (UTC).

TRAILS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC A FLORIDA NON PROFIT CORPORATION V. BORIS KHIYAYEV, ET AL

Case Summary

On 08/09/2022 TRAILS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC A FLORIDA NON PROFIT CORPORATION filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against BORIS KHIYAYEV,. This case was filed in Volusia County Courts, Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Dennis Craig. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********CICI

  • Filing Date:

    08/09/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Dennis Craig

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

TRAILS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC A FLORIDA NON PROFIT CORPORATION

FLORIDA COMMUNITY LAW GROUP P L

Defendants

BORIS KHIYAYEV

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF BORIS KHIYAYEV

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JARED BLOCK

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT / PETITION TO FORECLOSE ON LIEN

08/09/2022 : COMPLAINT / PETITION TO FORECLOSE ON LIEN

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

08/09/2022 : NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

08/09/2022 : CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

REQUEST SUMMONS

08/09/2022 : REQUEST SUMMONS

REQUEST SUMMONS

08/09/2022 : REQUEST SUMMONS

MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

08/09/2022 : MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

ORDER TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

08/12/2022 : ORDER TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

CIVIL COVER SHEET

08/12/2022 : CIVIL COVER SHEET

WORKSHEET

08/12/2022 : WORKSHEET

TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

08/16/2022 : TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

08/16/2022 : TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED

08/30/2022 : RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED

RETURNED SUMMONS UNEXECUTED

08/30/2022 : RETURNED SUMMONS UNEXECUTED

STIPULATION FOR/OF PAYMENT(S)

12/12/2022 : STIPULATION FOR/OF PAYMENT(S)

ORDER APPROVING / AFFIRMING / CONFIRMING STIPULATION or SETTLEMENT

12/14/2022 : ORDER APPROVING / AFFIRMING / CONFIRMING STIPULATION or SETTLEMENT

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15); Docket Type: ORDER APPROVING / AFFIRMING / CONFIRMING STIPULATION or SETTLEMENT; Description: Instrument: 2022280648 Book: 8348 Page: 2734 View: 2022280648

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14); Docket Type: STIPULATION FOR/OF PAYMENT(S); Description: agst Boris Khiyayev Instrument: 2022280646 Book: 8348 Page: 2720 View: 2022280646

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13); Docket Type: RETURNED SUMMONS UNEXECUTED; Description: Unkn Spouse of Boris Khiyayev

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12); Docket Type: RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED; Description: Boris Khiyayev

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11); Docket Type: TWENTY DAY SUMMONS; Description: To UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF BORIS KHIYAYEV Frwd to Pltf's Atty & Proc Server (Max) via e-service for SOP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10); Docket Type: TWENTY DAY SUMMONS; Description: To BORIS KHIYAYEV Frwd to Pltf's Atty & Proc Server (Max) via e-service for SOP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 400.00; Final Amount: 400.00; Credits: -400.00; Balance: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 5.00; Final Amount: 5.00; Credits: -5.00; Balance: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • FinancialQuantity: 2; Unit Amount: 10.00; Final Amount: 20.00; Credits: -20.00; Balance: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9); Docket Type: WORKSHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8); Docket Type: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7); Docket Type: ORDER TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6); Docket Type: MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.; Description: by The Trails Homeowners Assoc Inc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5); Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: to Unknown Spouse of Boris Khiyayev

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4); Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: to Boris Khiyayev

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3); Docket Type: CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2); Docket Type: NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS; Description: Instrument: 2022189113 Book: 8297 Page: 874 View: 2022189113

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1); Docket Type: COMPLAINT / PETITION TO FORECLOSE ON LIEN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less