This case was last updated from Volusia County Courts on 05/22/2023 at 06:04:32 (UTC).

TRAILS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC A FLORIDA NON PROFIT CORPORATION V. ANTHONY MANN, ET AL

Case Summary

On 10/04/2022 TRAILS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC A FLORIDA NON PROFIT CORPORATION filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against ANTHONY MANN,. This case was filed in Volusia County Courts, Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Mary G. Jolley. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********CICI

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Mary G. Jolley

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

TRAILS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC A FLORIDA NON PROFIT CORPORATION

FLORIDA COMMUNITY LAW GROUP P L

Defendants

ANTHONY MANN

LINDA LEE MANN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JARED BLOCK

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

10/04/2022 : CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT / PETITION TO FORECLOSE ON LIEN

10/04/2022 : COMPLAINT / PETITION TO FORECLOSE ON LIEN

WORKSHEET

10/04/2022 : WORKSHEET

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

10/04/2022 : NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

10/04/2022 : MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

REQUEST SUMMONS

10/04/2022 : REQUEST SUMMONS

REQUEST SUMMONS

10/04/2022 : REQUEST SUMMONS

TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

10/11/2022 : TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

10/11/2022 : TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

ORDER TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

10/12/2022 : ORDER TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

STIPULATION FOR/OF PAYMENT(S)

12/12/2022 : STIPULATION FOR/OF PAYMENT(S)

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS / NAME

02/23/2023 : NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS / NAME

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12); Docket Type: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS / NAME; Description: of law firm address by Florida Community Law Group PL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11); Docket Type: STIPULATION FOR/OF PAYMENT(S); Description: agst Anthony Mann et al Instrument: 2022281289 Book: 8348 Page: 4188 View: 2022281289

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10); Docket Type: ORDER TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 400.00; Final Amount: 400.00; Credits: -400.00; Balance: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • FinancialQuantity: 2; Unit Amount: 10.00; Final Amount: 20.00; Credits: -20.00; Balance: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 5.00; Final Amount: 5.00; Credits: -5.00; Balance: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9); Docket Type: TWENTY DAY SUMMONS; Description: To LINDA LEE MANN fwd to pltfs atty/proc server (Max) via eservice for SOP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8); Docket Type: TWENTY DAY SUMMONS; Description: To ANTHONY MANN fwd to pltfs atty/proc server (Max) via eservice for SOP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7); Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: to Linda Lee Mann

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6); Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: to Anthony Mann

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5); Docket Type: MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.; Description: by The Trails Homeowners Association Inc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4); Docket Type: NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS; Description: Instrument: 2022229812 Book: 8320 Page: 4765 View: 2022229812

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3); Docket Type: WORKSHEET; Description: real property

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2); Docket Type: COMPLAINT / PETITION TO FORECLOSE ON LIEN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1); Docket Type: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less