Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Volusia County Courts on 09/06/2020 at 10:34:10 (UTC).

TRACI RENEE SERPA V. HERMAN RODNEY SERPA

Case Summary

On 02/03/2020 TRACI RENEE SERPA filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against HERMAN RODNEY SERPA. This case was filed in Volusia County Courts, Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Stasia Warren. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********FMCI

  • Filing Date:

    02/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Volusia County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Stasia Warren

 

Party Details

Petitioner

TRACI RENEE SERPA

Respondent

HERMAN RODNEY SERPA

Not Classified By Court

TRACI RENEE DOYLE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

BARRY E HUGHES

900 Big Tree Road

South Daytona, FL 32119

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/16/2020
  • DocketSession Type: Docket Sounding; Court Officer: Stasia Warren; Location: SWZM, Zoom Meetings; Status: Cancelled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • Docket(#25) Docket Type: FINAL ORDER / JUDGMENT FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE; Description: w/att'd MSA **0 copies/ 0 envs** Instrument: 2020165248 Book: 7904 Page: 2098

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2020
  • Docket(#24) Docket Type: ORDER OF CASE MANAGEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • DocketSession Type: Case Management Conference; Court Officer: Stasia Warren; Location: City Island Courthouse; Status: Scheduled; Comments: ZOOM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • Docket(#23) Docket Type: MOTION FOR JUDGMENT / FINAL JUDGMENT; Description: by pet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • Docket(#22) Docket Type: NOTICE OF FILING; Description: copy of FL DL by pet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • Docket(#21) Docket Type: HEARING SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • Docket(#20) Docket Type: AGREEMENT MARITAL SETTLEMENT; Description: signed by both parties

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • Docket(#19) Docket Type: ORDER OF CASE MANAGEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • Docket(#18) Docket Type: NOTICE OF FILING; Description: cert of course completion by pet

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 02/03/2020
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 10.00; Final Amount: 10.00; Credits: -10.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • Docket(#9) Docket Type: SUMMONS ISSUED; Description: as to Petition for Dissolution of Marriage To HERMAN RODNEY SERPA **e-served to atty for service on resp**

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • Docket(#8) Docket Type: CERTIFICATE DIST PARENTING NOTICE/STANDING ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • Docket(#7) Docket Type: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS; Description: by atty **issued**

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • Docket(#6) Docket Type: NOTICE OF FILING SOCIAL SEC NUMBER; Description: pet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • Docket(#5) Docket Type: NOTICE FOR REDACTION/CONFIDENTIALITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • Docket(#4) Docket Type: FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT; Description: pet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • Docket(#3) Docket Type: AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION OF CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • Docket(#2) Docket Type: PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • Docket(#1) Docket Type: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BARRY HUGHES