Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Volusia County Courts on 03/08/2020 at 02:22:54 (UTC).

TODD DOUGLAS YORDE V. HALLIE MARIE DUNNING

Case Summary

On 07/22/2019 TODD DOUGLAS YORDE filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against HALLIE MARIE DUNNING. This case was filed in Volusia County Courts, Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Stasia Warren. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********FMCI

  • Filing Date:

    07/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Volusia County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Stasia Warren

 

Party Details

Petitioner

TODD DOUGLAS YORDE

Respondent

HALLIE MARIE DUNNING

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

LINDA D CARLEY

435 S Ridgewood Ave Ste 205

Daytona Beach, FL 32114

Respondent Attorney

JEFFREY A KLEIN

747 S Ridgewood Ave Ste 108

Daytona Bch, FL 32114

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/02/2020
  • Docket(#47) Docket Type: NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY; Description: by atty Stephanie S Klein

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2020
  • Docket(#46) Docket Type: ORDER OF CASE MANAGEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • HearingSession Type: Case Management Conference; Court Officer: Stasia Warren; Location: CI-11, City Island Courthouse; Status: Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • Docket(#45) Docket Type: HEARING SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • Docket(#44) Docket Type: MOTION TO ABATE; Description: by pet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • Docket(#43) Docket Type: COPY; Description: of court call

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • Docket(#42) Docket Type: ORDER OF CASE MANAGEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • HearingSession Type: Case Management Conference; Court Officer: Stasia Warren; Location: CI-11, City Island Courthouse; Status: Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • Docket(#41) Docket Type: HEARING SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • Docket(#40) Docket Type: ORDER OF CASE MANAGEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
36 More Docket Entries
  • 08/13/2019
  • Docket(#8) Docket Type: FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT; Description: Resp

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • Docket(#7) Docket Type: ANSWER BY/FOR RESPONDENT; Description: contested

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • Docket(#6) Docket Type: NOTICE / ORDER FOR CASE MGMT CONF.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • Docket(#5) Docket Type: RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED; Description: as to Hallie Marie Dunning served 7/26/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 10.00; Final Amount: 10.00; Credits: -10.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • Docket(#4) Docket Type: SUMMONS ISSUED; Description: as to PETITION TO DETERMINE PATERNITY AND FOR RELATED RELIEF To HALLIE MARIE DUNNING Orig/e-served to Atty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 300.00; Final Amount: 300.00; Credits: -300.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • Docket(#3) Docket Type: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • Docket(#2) Docket Type: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS; Description: by Todd Douglas Yorde

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • Docket(#1) Docket Type: PETITION FOR PATERNITY; Description: w/atch'd UCJEA,Not Conf Info, & Not Soc Security

    Read MoreRead Less