This case was last updated from Volusia County Courts on 08/05/2021 at 18:32:50 (UTC).

TIFFANY SHAVONNE WATSON V. GARY CHRISTOPHER PELHAM, ET AL

Case Summary

On 07/06/2021 TIFFANY SHAVONNE WATSON filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against GARY CHRISTOPHER PELHAM. This case was filed in Volusia County Courts, Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Mary G. Jolley. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********CICI

  • Filing Date:

    07/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Mary G. Jolley

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

TIFFANY SHAVONNE WATSON

DAN NEWLIN & PARTNERS

Defendants

GARY CHRISTOPHER PELHAM

GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY A FOREIGN PROFIT CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DONNA ZMIJEWSKI

4000 Hollywood Blvd Ste 501 South

Hollywood, FL 33021

 

Court Documents

ORDER TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

07/22/2021 : ORDER TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION OF SERVICE

07/20/2021 : AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION OF SERVICE

MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

07/16/2021 : MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

07/12/2021 : TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

07/12/2021 : TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

REQUEST SUMMONS

07/06/2021 : REQUEST SUMMONS

REQUEST SUMMONS

07/06/2021 : REQUEST SUMMONS

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

07/06/2021 : REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

07/06/2021 : REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

07/06/2021 : REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

07/06/2021 : REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

07/06/2021 : NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

07/06/2021 : NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

COMPLAINT

07/06/2021 : COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

07/06/2021 : CIVIL COVER SHEET

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Docket Type: ORDER TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Docket Type: AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION OF SERVICE; Description: of summons & complaint, exec, Geico Indemnity Co

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Docket Type: MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.; Description: by Tiffany Shavonne Watson

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 400.00; Final Amount: 400.00; Credits: -400.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • FinancialQuantity: 2; Unit Amount: 10.00; Final Amount: 20.00; Credits: -20.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Docket Type: TWENTY DAY SUMMONS; Description: To GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY A FOREIGN PROFIT CORPORATION rtn to Ptf's Atty via e service for sop

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Docket Type: TWENTY DAY SUMMONS; Description: To GARY CHRISTOPHER PELHAM rtn to Ptf's Atty via e service for sop

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: to Geico Indemnity COmpany a foreign profit corporation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: to Gary Christopher Pelham

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Docket Type: REQUEST TO PRODUCE; Description: to Gary Christopher Pelham by Tiffany Shavonne Watson

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Docket Type: REQUEST TO PRODUCE; Description: to Geico Indemnity COmpany by Tiffany Shavonne Watson

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Docket Type: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Description: to Geico Indemnity COmpany by Tiffany Shavonne Watson

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Docket Type: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Description: to Gary CHristopher Pelham by Tiffany Shavonne Watson

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Docket Type: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Description: to Gary CHristopher Pelham by Tiffany Shavonne Watson

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Docket Type: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Description: to Geico Indemnity COmpany by Tiffany Shavonne Watson

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Docket Type: COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Docket Type: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DAN NEWLIN & PARTNERS is a litigant

Latest cases where GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ZMIJEWSKI, DONNA S