This case was last updated from Volusia County Courts on 12/04/2022 at 05:50:09 (UTC).

THERESA POWELL V. LADARIUS GARDNER, ET AL

Case Summary

On 09/15/2022 THERESA POWELL filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against LADARIUS GARDNER,. This case was filed in Volusia County Courts, Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Dennis Craig. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********CICI

  • Filing Date:

    09/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Dennis Craig

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

THERESA POWELL

LAW OFFICE OF ROTSTEIN & SHIFFMAN LLP

Daytona Beach, FL 32118

Defendants

LADARIUS GARDNER

South Daytona, FL 32119

WASTE PRO OF FLORIDA INC

Longwood, FL 32779

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JONATHAN I ROTSTEIN

Attorney at ROTSTEIN & SHIFFMAN LLP

309 Oakridge Blvd Ste B

Daytona Beach, FL 32118

Defendant Attorney

RODNEY C LUNDY

Two S Orange Ave, Ste 300

Orlando, FL 32801

 

Court Documents

RETURNED SUMMONS UNEXECUTED

11/09/2022 : RETURNED SUMMONS UNEXECUTED

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

11/08/2022 : REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

11/08/2022 : REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

11/08/2022 : NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS

11/04/2022 : DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS

REPLY OF/TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

11/04/2022 : REPLY OF/TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

RESPONSE BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

11/04/2022 : RESPONSE BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

10/31/2022 : NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

10/27/2022 : NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

10/27/2022 : REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

10/27/2022 : REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

ANSWER BY/FOR DEFENDANT

10/27/2022 : ANSWER BY/FOR DEFENDANT

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

10/27/2022 : NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION OF SERVICE

10/11/2022 : AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION OF SERVICE

TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

09/19/2022 : TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

09/19/2022 : TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

REQUEST SUMMONS

09/15/2022 : REQUEST SUMMONS

COMPLAINT

09/15/2022 : COMPLAINT

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19); Docket Type: RETURNED SUMMONS UNEXECUTED; Description: Ladarius Gardner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18); Docket Type: REQUEST TO PRODUCE; Description: to Waste Pro of Florida Inc by Theresa Powell

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17); Docket Type: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Description: to Waste Pro of Florida Inc by Theresa Powell

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16); Docket Type: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Description: to Waste Pro of Florida Inc by Theresa Powell

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15); Docket Type: DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS; Description: Jonathan I Rotstein

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14); Docket Type: REPLY OF/TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Description: Theresa Powell (as to Waste Pro of Florida Inc)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13); Docket Type: RESPONSE BY/FOR PLAINTIFF; Description: Theresa Powell to Waste Pro of Florida Inc's reqs for admissions

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12); Docket Type: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION; Description: of Theresa Powell

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11); Docket Type: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Description: to Theresa Powell by Waste Pro of Florida Inc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10); Docket Type: REQUEST TO PRODUCE; Description: to Theresa Powell by Waste Pro of Florida Inc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 10/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8); Docket Type: ANSWER BY/FOR DEFENDANT; Description: Waste Pro of Florida w/affirm defenses & demand for jury trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7); Docket Type: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Description: of Rodney C Lundy Esq obo Waste Pro of Florida & designation of email

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6); Docket Type: AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION OF SERVICE; Description: exec Waste Pro of Florida Inc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 400.00; Final Amount: 400.00; Credits: -400.00; Balance: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • FinancialQuantity: 2; Unit Amount: 10.00; Final Amount: 20.00; Credits: -20.00; Balance: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5); Docket Type: TWENTY DAY SUMMONS; Description: To WASTE PRO OF FLORIDA, INC. Frwd to Pltf's Atty via e-service for SOP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4); Docket Type: TWENTY DAY SUMMONS; Description: To LADARIUS GARDNER Frwd to Pltf's Atty via e-service for SOP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3); Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: To all named Dfnts

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2); Docket Type: COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1); Docket Type: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LUNDY RODNEY C