This case was last updated from Volusia County Circuit Courts on 06/02/2022 at 19:01:25 (UTC).

TERRACE HILL HOMEOWNERS CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION INC A FLORIDA NON PROFIT CORPORATION V. UNKNOWN HEIR BENEFICIARIES DEVISEES ASSIGNEES LIENOR CREDITORS TRUSTEES AND ALL OTHERS WHO MAY, ETC.

Case Summary

On 04/12/2022 TERRACE HILL HOMEOWNERS CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION INC A FLORIDA NON PROFIT CORPORATION filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against UNKNOWN HEIR BENEFICIARIES DEVISEES ASSIGNEES LIENOR CREDITORS TRUSTEES AND ALL OTHERS WHO MAY, ETC. This case was filed in Volusia County Circuit Courts, Volusia County Courthouse Deland located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Randell H. Rowe, III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********CIDL

  • Filing Date:

    04/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Randell H. Rowe, III

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

TERRACE HILL HOMEOWNERS CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION INC A FLORIDA NON PROFIT CORPORATION

FLORIDA COMMUNITY LAW GROUP P L

Defendants

UNKNOWN HEIR BENEFICIARIES DEVISEES ASSIGNEES LIENOR CREDITORS TRUSTEES AND ALL OTHERS WHO MAY

UNKNOWN TENANTS IN POSSESSION IF ANY

Not Classified By Court

ELIZABETH R BRADFORD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JARED BLOCK

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

04/12/2022 : CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT / PETITION TO FORECLOSE

04/12/2022 : COMPLAINT / PETITION TO FORECLOSE

WORKSHEET

04/12/2022 : WORKSHEET

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

04/12/2022 : NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

04/12/2022 : MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

REQUEST SUMMONS

04/12/2022 : REQUEST SUMMONS

PREVIOUSLY FILED THROUGH PORTAL

04/18/2022 : PREVIOUSLY FILED THROUGH PORTAL

TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

04/20/2022 : TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

ORDER TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

05/12/2022 : ORDER TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

RETURNED SUMMONS UNEXECUTED

05/27/2022 : RETURNED SUMMONS UNEXECUTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Docket Type: RETURNED SUMMONS UNEXECUTED; Description: Unknown Tenant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Docket Type: ORDER TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Docket Type: TWENTY DAY SUMMONS; Description: To UNKNOWN TENANT(S) IN POSSESSION, IF ANY Frwd to Pltf's Atty & Proc Server (Max) via e-service for SOP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Docket Type: PREVIOUSLY FILED THROUGH PORTAL; Description: Notice of Lis Pendens - w/ receipt of $5.00 LP fee attached

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 400.00; Final Amount: 400.00; Credits: -400.00; Balance: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 10.00; Final Amount: 10.00; Credits: -10.00; Balance: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 5.00; Final Amount: 5.00; Credits: -5.00; Balance: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: To Unknown Tenants in Possession If Any

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Docket Type: MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.; Description: By Terrace Hill Homeowners Condo Assn Inc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Docket Type: NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS; Description: Instrument: 2022087738 Book: 8237 Page: 374

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Docket Type: WORKSHEET; Description: Real Property

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Docket Type: COMPLAINT / PETITION TO FORECLOSE; Description: Lien

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Docket Type: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less