Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Volusia County Circuit Courts on 07/01/2020 at 17:08:01 (UTC).

TERESA LOPRESTI V. FAMILY SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 09/10/2019 TERESA LOPRESTI filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against FAMILY SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Volusia County Circuit Courts, Volusia County Courthouse Deland located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Kathryn Weston. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********CIDL

  • Filing Date:

    09/10/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    Volusia County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Volusia County Courthouse Deland

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Kathryn Weston

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

TERESA LOPRESTI

VARGAS GONZALEZ HEVIA BALDWIN LLP

Defendants

UNITED PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

FAMILY SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LOUIS A GONZALEZ

2745 W Fairbanks Avenue 1St Floor

Winter Park, FL 32789

Defendant Attorney

MAGGIE E POTTER

Galloway Johnson Tompkins Burr & Smith Plc 400 N Ashley Dr Ste 1000

Tampa, FL 33602

 

Court Documents

RESPONSE BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

12/30/2019 : RESPONSE BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

NOTICE OF SERVICE

12/13/2019 : NOTICE OF SERVICE

NOTICE BY/FOR DEFENDANT

11/22/2019 : NOTICE BY/FOR DEFENDANT

RESPONSE BY/FOR DEFENDANT

11/22/2019 : RESPONSE BY/FOR DEFENDANT

RESPONSE BY/FOR DEFENDANT

11/22/2019 : RESPONSE BY/FOR DEFENDANT

NOTICE OF SERVICE

11/22/2019 : NOTICE OF SERVICE

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

11/01/2019 : REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

11/01/2019 : NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

10/23/2019 : NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

AMENDED MOTION/PETITION/COMPLAINT

10/23/2019 : AMENDED MOTION/PETITION/COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

10/14/2019 : NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

09/15/2019 : TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

09/10/2019 : NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

09/10/2019 : REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

09/10/2019 : REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS

09/10/2019 : DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS

COMPLAINT

09/10/2019 : COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

09/10/2019 : CIVIL COVER SHEET

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) Docket Type: NOTICE OF SERVICE; Description: verified answers to interrogs by Teresa Lopresti

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) Docket Type: RESPONSE BY/FOR PLAINTIFF; Description: Teresa Lopresti to req for production

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) Docket Type: NOTICE OF SERVICE; Description: unverified answers to interrogs by Teresa Lopresti

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) Docket Type: NOTICE OF SERVICE; Description: verified answers to 1st set of interrogs by Family Security

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) Docket Type: MOTION FOR EXTENSION / EXTENDING TIME; Description: to respond to discovery by Teresa Lopresti

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) Docket Type: NOTICE BY/FOR DEFENDANT; Description: Family Security of privilege log

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Docket Type: RESPONSE BY/FOR DEFENDANT; Description: Family Security to amd req for production

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Docket Type: RESPONSE BY/FOR DEFENDANT; Description: Family Security to amd req for admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Docket Type: NOTICE OF SERVICE; Description: answers to 1st set of interrogs by Family Security

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Docket Type: REQUEST TO PRODUCE; Description: (1st) to Teresa Lopresti by Family Security Ins Co

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 09/15/2019
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 400.00; Final Amount: 400.00; Credits: -400.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2019
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 10.00; Final Amount: 10.00; Credits: -10.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Docket Type: TWENTY DAY SUMMONS; Description: To UNITED PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY rtn to atty/sop via e-service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Docket Type: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Description: (1st) to United Property & Casualty Ins Co by Teresa Lopresti

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Docket Type: REQUEST TO PRODUCE; Description: (1st) to United Property & Casualty Ins Co by Teresa Lopresti

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Docket Type: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Description: to United Property & Casualty Ins Co by Teresa Lopresti

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Docket Type: DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS; Description: Louis A Gonzalez

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: as to United Property & Casualty Ins Co

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Docket Type: COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Docket Type: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FAMILY SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY INC is a litigant

Latest cases where United Property & Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer POTTER MAGGIE E