Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Volusia County Circuit Courts on 02/11/2020 at 17:08:24 (UTC).

TD BANK USA N A V. RUTH R SCHOFIELD

Case Summary

On 12/12/2019 TD BANK USA N A filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against RUTH R SCHOFIELD. This case was filed in Volusia County Circuit Courts, Volusia County Courthouse Deland located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Angela A. Dempsey. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********CODL

  • Filing Date:

    12/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Volusia County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Volusia County Courthouse Deland

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Angela A. Dempsey

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

TD BANK USA N A

RAS LAVRAR LLC

Defendant

RUTH R SCHOFIELD

Deltona, FL 32738-4466

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DREW LINEN

Attorney at RAS LAVRAR LLC

1133 S University Dr 2Nd Floor

Plantation, FL 33324

 

Court Documents

ORDER APPROVING / AFFIRMING / CONFIRMING STIPULATION or SETTLEMENT

02/06/2020 : ORDER APPROVING / AFFIRMING / CONFIRMING STIPULATION or SETTLEMENT

PROPOSED

02/04/2020 : PROPOSED

STIPULATION FOR/OF PAYMENT(S)

02/04/2020 : STIPULATION FOR/OF PAYMENT(S)

DEFAULT

01/24/2020 : DEFAULT

COURT NOTES

01/23/2020 : COURT NOTES

RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED

01/17/2020 : RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED

ORDER TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

01/08/2020 : ORDER TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS

12/13/2019 : PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS

REQUEST SUMMONS

12/12/2019 : REQUEST SUMMONS

MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

12/12/2019 : MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

12/12/2019 : NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

COMPLAINT

12/12/2019 : COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Docket Type: ORDER APPROVING / AFFIRMING / CONFIRMING STIPULATION or SETTLEMENT; Description: Instrument: 2020028560 Book: 7812 Page: 4411

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Docket Type: PROPOSED; Description: Order Accepting Stipulation & Dismissing Case

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Docket Type: STIPULATION FOR/OF PAYMENT(S); Description: agst Ruth R Schofield Instrument: 2020025755 Book: 7811 Page: 174

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Docket Type: DEFAULT; Description: as to Ruth R Schofield by Judge

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • HearingSession Type: Pre-Trial; Court Officer: Angela A. Dempsey; Location: 1, DeLand; Status: Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Docket Type: COURT NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Docket Type: RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED; Description: Ruth R Schofield

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Docket Type: ORDER TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 175.00; Final Amount: 175.00; Credits: -175.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 10.00; Final Amount: 10.00; Credits: -10.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Docket Type: PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS; Description: To RUTH R SCHOFIELD fwd to pltfs atty/Max via eservice for SOP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: to Ruth R Schofield

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Docket Type: MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.; Description: by TD Bank USA N.A. w/o prop order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Docket Type: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Description: of Flynn Lavrar obo TD Bank USA N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • Docket(#2) Docket Type: NOTICE FOR REDACTION/CONFIDENTIALITY; Description: by TD Bank USA N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Docket Type: COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RAS LAVRAR LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where TD Bank, NA is a litigant