Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Volusia County Circuit Courts on 02/24/2020 at 18:55:25 (UTC).

TD BANK USA N A V. CHRESCENDA MARTIN

Case Summary

On 05/23/2019 TD BANK USA N A filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against CHRESCENDA MARTIN. This case was filed in Volusia County Circuit Courts, Volusia County Courthouse Deland located in Volusia, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Christopher Kelly and Angela A. Dempsey. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********CODL

  • Filing Date:

    05/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Volusia County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Volusia County Courthouse Deland

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Christopher Kelly

Angela A. Dempsey

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

TD BANK USA N A

RAS LAVRAR LLC

Defendant

CHRESCENDA MARTIN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FLYNN LAVRAR

Attorney at RAS LAVRAR LLC

1133 S University Dr 2Nd Floor

Plantation, FL 33324

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF HEARING: INTENTION TO DISMISS

02/17/2020 : NOTICE OF HEARING: INTENTION TO DISMISS

NOTICE OF HEARING: INTENTION TO DISMISS

02/17/2020 : NOTICE OF HEARING: INTENTION TO DISMISS

AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION OF PROOF / AMOUNT DUE

08/08/2019 : AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION OF PROOF / AMOUNT DUE

AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE / VENUE

08/08/2019 : AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE / VENUE

CERTIFICATE OF/FOR COSTS

08/08/2019 : CERTIFICATE OF/FOR COSTS

MOTION FOR JUDGMENT / FINAL JUDGMENT

08/08/2019 : MOTION FOR JUDGMENT / FINAL JUDGMENT

DEFAULT

07/05/2019 : DEFAULT

COURT NOTES

07/05/2019 : COURT NOTES

RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED

06/19/2019 : RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED

ORDER TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

06/05/2019 : ORDER TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS

05/23/2019 : PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS

REQUEST SUMMONS

05/23/2019 : REQUEST SUMMONS

MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

05/23/2019 : MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS

05/23/2019 : DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS

COMPLAINT

05/23/2019 : COMPLAINT

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/02/2020
  • HearingSession Type: Lack of Prosecution Hearing; Court Officer: Angela A. Dempsey; Location: 1, DeLand; Status: Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Docket Type: NOTICE OF HEARING: INTENTION TO DISMISS; Description: Lack of Prosecution Hearing Notice for CHRESCENDA MARTIN.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Docket Type: NOTICE OF HEARING: INTENTION TO DISMISS; Description: Lack of Prosecution Hearing Notice for FLYNN LAVRAR, attorney for TD BANK USA N A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Docket Type: AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION OF PROOF / AMOUNT DUE; Description: by Michael Rogers obo TD Bank USA,N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Docket Type: AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE / VENUE; Description: as to Chrescenda Martin

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Docket Type: CERTIFICATE OF/FOR COSTS; Description: by Drew Linen,Esq

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Docket Type: MOTION FOR JUDGMENT / FINAL JUDGMENT; Description: by TD Bank USA,N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • HearingSession Type: Pre-Trial; Court Officer: Christopher Kelly; Location: 1, DeLand; Status: Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Docket Type: DEFAULT; Description: as to Chrescenda Martin

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Docket Type: COURT NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Docket Type: RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED; Description: Chrescenda Martin

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Docket Type: ORDER TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 175.00; Final Amount: 175.00; Credits: -175.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 10.00; Final Amount: 10.00; Credits: -10.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Docket Type: PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS; Description: To CHRESCENDA MARTIN ret to atty via e service for SOP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: to Chrescenda Martin

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Docket Type: MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.; Description: by TD Bank USA N A w/o Or

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • Docket(#3) Docket Type: NOTICE FOR REDACTION/CONFIDENTIALITY; Description: by TD Bank USA N A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Docket Type: DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS; Description: by Flynn LaVrar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Docket Type: COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RAS LAVRAR LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where TD Bank, NA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LaVrar, Flynn, ESQ.