Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Volusia County Circuit Courts on 05/24/2020 at 00:20:07 (UTC).

TD BANK USA N A V. BONNIE S BUCIO

Case Summary

On 02/06/2020 TD BANK USA N A filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against BONNIE S BUCIO. This case was filed in Volusia County Circuit Courts, Volusia County Courthouse Deland located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is A. Christian Miller. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********CODL

  • Filing Date:

    02/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Volusia County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Volusia County Courthouse Deland

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

A. Christian Miller

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

TD BANK USA N A

BROCK & SCOTT PLLC

Defendant

BONNIE S BUCIO

Edgewater, FL 32141-5017

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

J L PEREZ

Attorney at BROCK & SCOTT PLLC

1315 Westbrook Plaza Dr

Winston-Salem North, CARO 27103

Defendant Attorney

JESSICA I MOST

2401 Northwest Twenty Third Street Suite 42

Oklahoma City, OK 73107

 

Court Documents

ORDER APPROVING / AFFIRMING / CONFIRMING STIPULATION or SETTLEMENT

05/22/2020 : ORDER APPROVING / AFFIRMING / CONFIRMING STIPULATION or SETTLEMENT

STIPULATION FOR/OF PAYMENT(S)

05/12/2020 : STIPULATION FOR/OF PAYMENT(S)

ORDER RESETTING / RESCHEDULING

04/02/2020 : ORDER RESETTING / RESCHEDULING

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

03/24/2020 : NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

ORDER FOR PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE, ETC.

03/17/2020 : ORDER FOR PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE, ETC.

RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED

03/04/2020 : RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED

ORDER TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

02/10/2020 : ORDER TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS

02/07/2020 : PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS

REQUEST SUMMONS

02/06/2020 : REQUEST SUMMONS

MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

02/06/2020 : MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

02/06/2020 : STATEMENT OF CLAIM

CIVIL COVER SHEET

02/06/2020 : CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Docket Type: ORDER APPROVING / AFFIRMING / CONFIRMING STIPULATION or SETTLEMENT; Description: Instrument: 2020092412 Book: 7855 Page: 606

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • DocketSession Type: Pre-Trial; Court Officer: A. Christian Miller; Location: 1, DeLand; Status: Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Docket Type: STIPULATION FOR/OF PAYMENT(S); Description: agst Bonnie S Bucio Instrument: 2020087717 Book: 7852 Page: 508

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • DocketSession Type: Pre-Trial; Court Officer: A. Christian Miller; Location: 1, DeLand; Status: Cancelled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Docket Type: ORDER RESETTING / RESCHEDULING; Description: P/T

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • DocketSession Type: Pre-Trial; Court Officer: A. Christian Miller; Location: 1, DeLand; Status: Cancelled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Docket Type: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Description: of Jessica I Most Esq obo Bonnie S Bucio w/designation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Docket Type: ORDER FOR PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE, ETC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Docket Type: RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED; Description: Bonnie S Bucio

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Docket Type: ORDER TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 300.00; Final Amount: 300.00; Credits: -300.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 10.00; Final Amount: 10.00; Credits: -10.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Docket Type: PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS; Description: To BONNIE S BUCIO fwd to pltfs atty via e-service for sop

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: to Bonnie S Bucio

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Docket Type: MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.; Description: by TD Bank USA NA w/no prop order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Docket Type: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Docket Type: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BROCK & SCOTT PLLC is a litigant

Latest cases where TD Bank, NA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MOST , JESSICA I