This case was last updated from Volusia County Courts on 04/23/2020 at 11:01:20 (UTC).

SYNCHRONY BANK V. LISA EMAKPO

Case Summary

On 11/14/2019 SYNCHRONY BANK filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against LISA EMAKPO. This case was filed in Volusia County Courts, Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Dawn P. Fields. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********COCI

  • Filing Date:

    11/14/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Volusia County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Dawn P. Fields

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SYNCHRONY BANK

RAUSCH STURM

Defendant

LISA EMAKPO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SARAH C DALEY

Rausch Sturm 5801 Ulmerton Rd Ste 201

Clearwater, FL 33760-3951

 

Court Documents

DEFAULT

12/17/2019 : DEFAULT

COURT NOTES

12/17/2019 : COURT NOTES

RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED

11/27/2019 : RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED

ORDER TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

11/20/2019 : ORDER TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS

11/18/2019 : PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS

REQUEST SUMMONS

11/14/2019 : REQUEST SUMMONS

MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

11/14/2019 : MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

COMPLAINT

11/14/2019 : COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/17/2019
  • DocketSession Type: Pre-Trial; Court Officer: Dawn P. Fields; Location: CI-10, City Island Courthouse; Status: Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Docket Type: DEFAULT; Description: as to Lisa Emakpo

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Docket Type: COURT NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Docket Type: RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED; Description: Lisa Emakpo

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Docket Type: ORDER TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 300.00; Final Amount: 300.00; Credits: -300.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 10.00; Final Amount: 10.00; Credits: -10.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Docket Type: PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS; Description: To LISA EMAKPO ret to atty via e service for SOP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: to Lisa Emakpo

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Docket Type: MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.; Description: by Synchrony Bank w/o Or

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • Docket(#2) Docket Type: NOTICE FOR REDACTION/CONFIDENTIALITY; Description: by Synchrony Bank

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Docket Type: COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less