Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Volusia County Courts on 03/26/2020 at 07:31:28 (UTC).

STAND UP MRI OF BOCA RATON P A, ETC. V. PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 11/16/2018 STAND UP MRI OF BOCA RATON P A, ETC filed an Other lawsuit against PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Volusia County Courts, Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex located in Volusia, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are David A. Cromartie and Christopher Kelly. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********COCI

  • Filing Date:

    11/16/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Volusia County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

David A. Cromartie

Christopher Kelly

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SIMOES DAVILA GROUP P A

STAND UP MRI OF BOCA RATON P A

ARIANNA JOSEPH

Defendant

PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

KEITH M PETROCHKO

Attorney at J DAVID DAVILA LAW GROUP

351 E New York Ave Suite 200

Deland, FL 32724

MICHELLE REEVES

Attorney at SIMOES DAVILA PLLC

2170 West Sr 434 Ste 450

Longwood, FL 32779

Defendant Attorney

BENJAMIN R FLOYD

901 N Lake Destiny Rd Ste 105

Maitland, FL 32751

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF HEARING: INTENTION TO DISMISS

03/12/2020 : NOTICE OF HEARING: INTENTION TO DISMISS

NOTICE OF/FOR HEARING

06/07/2019 : NOTICE OF/FOR HEARING

NOTICE OF SERVICE

02/20/2019 : NOTICE OF SERVICE

MOTION BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

01/07/2019 : MOTION BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

RESPONSE BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

01/07/2019 : RESPONSE BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

CONTINUED FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS

12/11/2018 : CONTINUED FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS

PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS

11/20/2018 : PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS

REQUEST SUMMONS

11/16/2018 : REQUEST SUMMONS

COMPLAINT

11/16/2018 : COMPLAINT

NOTICE / ORDER OF CANCELING OF/FOR HEARING

09/05/2019 : NOTICE / ORDER OF CANCELING OF/FOR HEARING

REQUEST BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

08/19/2019 : REQUEST BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION BY/FOR DEFENDANT

08/13/2019 : AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION BY/FOR DEFENDANT

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

05/17/2019 : NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF SERVICE

03/18/2019 : NOTICE OF SERVICE

STIPULATION AND ORDER

02/05/2019 : STIPULATION AND ORDER

ORDER FOR PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE, ETC.

01/14/2019 : ORDER FOR PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE, ETC.

REQUEST BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

01/07/2019 : REQUEST BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

ANSWER BY/FOR DEFENDANT

12/31/2018 : ANSWER BY/FOR DEFENDANT

31 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/19/2020
  • DocketSession Type: Lack of Prosecution Hearing; Court Officer: Christopher Kelly; Location: CI-7, City Island Courthouse; Status: Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#43) Docket Type: NOTICE OF HEARING: INTENTION TO DISMISS; Description: Lack of Prosecution Hearing Notice for SIMOES DAVILA GROUP P A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) Docket Type: NOTICE OF HEARING: INTENTION TO DISMISS; Description: Lack of Prosecution Hearing Notice for BENJAMIN R FLOYD, attorney for PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#41) Docket Type: NOTICE OF HEARING: INTENTION TO DISMISS; Description: Lack of Prosecution Hearing Notice for MICHELLE REEVES, attorney for STAND UP MRI OF BOCA RATON P A, ARIANNA JOSEPH.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • DocketSession Type: Hearing; Court Officer: David A. Cromartie; Location: CI305, City Island Courthouse; Status: Cancelled; Comments: M/SJ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) Docket Type: NOTICE / ORDER OF CANCELING OF/FOR HEARING; Description: by Progressive Select Ins Co

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) Docket Type: NOTICE / ORDER OF CANCELING OF TAKING DEPOSITION; Description: of Corp Rep of Progressive Select Ins Co

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) Docket Type: REQUEST BY/FOR PLAINTIFF; Description: Stand Up MRI of Boca Raton PA etc for judicial notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) Docket Type: NOTICE OF FILING; Description: docs in support of mtn for summary dispo by Stand Up MRI of Boca Raton PA etc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) Docket Type: AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION BY/FOR DEFENDANT; Description: Jamie Martin obo Progressive Select Ins Co

    Read MoreRead Less
29 More Docket Entries
  • 12/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Docket Type: MOTION RESETTING / RESCHEDULING; Description: P/T

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Docket Type: RETURNED SUMMONS SERVICE ACCEPTED BY; Description: CFO State of Florida obo Progressive Select Insurance Company & emailed 12-12-2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Docket Type: MOTION TO INVOKE RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE; Description: by Progressive sSlect Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • DocketSession Type: Pre-Trial; Court Officer: David A. Cromartie; Location: CI-7, City Island Courthouse; Status: Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Docket Type: CONTINUED FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Docket Type: PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS; Description: To PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY ret to atty via e service for SOP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 175.00; Final Amount: 175.00; Credits: -175.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 10.00; Final Amount: 10.00; Credits: -10.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: to Progressive etc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Docket Type: COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STAND-UP MRI OF BOCA RATON, P.A. is a litigant

Latest cases where PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BENJAMIN FLOYD