This case was last updated from Volusia County Courts on 02/24/2020 at 20:20:25 (UTC).

SPRINGBOK COLLECTIONS LLC, ETC. V. GEICO CASUALTY COMPANY, ET AL

Case Summary

On 08/27/2017 SPRINGBOK COLLECTIONS LLC, ETC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against GEICO CASUALTY COMPANY. This case was filed in Volusia County Courts, Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex located in Volusia, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are David A. Cromartie and Christopher Kelly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********COCI

  • Filing Date:

    08/27/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Volusia County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

David A. Cromartie

Christopher Kelly

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

AMORGINOS & BARROWS P A

CHWR LLC

TIMOTHY CHANEYFIELD

SPRINGBOK COLLECTIONS LLC

SMART RIDE WINDSHIELD REPAIR

AMORGINOS PLLC

Defendants

GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY

GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY

1St Party Defendant

GEICO CASUALTY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SEAN M AMORGINOS

Attorney at AMORGINOS PLLC

1750 N Maitland Ave

Maitland, FL 32751

Defendant Attorney

JONATHON WESLEY STEPHENS

Law Office Of Kelly L Wilson 1000 Legion Place Ste 850

Orlando, FL 32801

 

Court Documents

MOTION FOR SUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT

01/16/2019 : MOTION FOR SUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT

OBJECTION BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

10/25/2018 : OBJECTION BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

MOTION TO COMPEL

04/19/2018 : MOTION TO COMPEL

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS / NAME

03/30/2018 : NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS / NAME

MOTION TO STRIKE

11/15/2017 : MOTION TO STRIKE

REQUEST BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

10/30/2017 : REQUEST BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

10/30/2017 : REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

10/26/2017 : NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

STIPULATION

09/28/2017 : STIPULATION

NOTICE OF FILING

08/09/2019 : NOTICE OF FILING

MOTION BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

07/25/2019 : MOTION BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS / NAME

06/13/2019 : NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS / NAME

OBJECTION BY/FOR DEFENDANT

05/07/2019 : OBJECTION BY/FOR DEFENDANT

NOTICE OF FILING

04/16/2019 : NOTICE OF FILING

MOTION FOR EXTENSION / EXTENDING TIME

02/13/2018 : MOTION FOR EXTENSION / EXTENDING TIME

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

10/30/2017 : REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

ANSWER BY/FOR DEFENDANT

10/26/2017 : ANSWER BY/FOR DEFENDANT

RETURNED SUMMONS SERVICE ACCEPTED BY

10/03/2017 : RETURNED SUMMONS SERVICE ACCEPTED BY

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) Docket Type: MOTION IN LIMINE; Description: by Springbok Collections LLC etc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) Docket Type: NOTICE OF FILING; Description: Supplemental Authority in Support of Pltf's Motion for Summary Judgment by Springbok Collections LLC.,etc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) Docket Type: OBJECTION BY/FOR DEFENDANT; Description: GEICO General Insurance Company to pltf's mtnto det burden of proof

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) Docket Type: MOTION BY/FOR PLAINTIFF; Description: Springbok Collections LLC.,etc to Determine Burden of Proof

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) Docket Type: REQUEST BY/FOR PLAINTIFF; Description: Springbok Collections LLC etc for depo

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) Docket Type: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS / NAME; Description: Amorginos PLLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) Docket Type: OBJECTION BY/FOR DEFENDANT; Description: Geico General Ins Co to request for judician notice of Safelite webpage

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) Docket Type: NOTICE OF FILING; Description: record evidence in support of Motion for Summary Final Judgment by Springbok Collections,LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) Docket Type: MOTION FOR SUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT; Description: by Springbok Collections LLC.,etc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) Docket Type: DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS; Description: by Dillon Kate McLean Esq

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 10/03/2017
  • HearingSession Type: Pre-Trial; Court Officer: Christopher Kelly; Location: CI-7, City Island Courthouse; Status: Cancelled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Docket Type: RETURNED SUMMONS SERVICE ACCEPTED BY; Description: State of Florida obo Geico General Ins Co

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Docket Type: ORDER APPROVING / AFFIRMING / CONFIRMING STIPULATION or SETTLEMENT; Description: waiving pretrial appearance & invoking rules of civil procedure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Docket Type: STIPULATION; Description: Waiving Appearance at Pretrial Conference by all parties

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 10.00; Final Amount: 10.00; Credits: -10.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2017
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 55.00; Final Amount: 55.00; Credits: -55.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Docket Type: PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS; Description: To GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY fwd to pltf's atty via e-service for SOP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: to Geico General Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Docket Type: COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Docket Type: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less