This case was last updated from Volusia County Courts on 06/17/2022 at 20:11:19 (UTC).

SPACE COAST CORPORATE HEALTH SERVICES P A D B A CLOW CHIROPRACTIC OFFICE A A O MATTHEW OGBURN V. SEDGWICK CLAIMS MANAGEMENT SERVICES INC

Case Summary

On 05/18/2022 SPACE COAST CORPORATE HEALTH SERVICES P A D B A CLOW CHIROPRACTIC OFFICE A A O MATTHEW OGBURN filed an Other lawsuit against SEDGWICK CLAIMS MANAGEMENT SERVICES INC. This case was filed in Volusia County Courts, Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Wesley Heidt. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********COCI

  • Filing Date:

    05/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Wesley Heidt

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SPACE COAST CORPORATE HEALTH SERVICES P A D B A CLOW CHIROPRACTIC OFFICE A A O MATTHEW OGBURN

CLOW CHIROPRACTIC OFFICE

MATTHEW OGBURN

KIMBERLY SIMOES P A

Deland, FL 32720

Defendant

SEDGWICK CLAIMS MANAGEMENT SERVICES INC

Tallahassee, FL 32301

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KIMBERLY P SIMOES

Attorney at KIMBERLY P SIMOES P A

910 Sw 1St Ave Suite 200

Ocala, FL 34471

Defendant Attorney

BLANCA D CRUZ

Attorney at BLANCA D CRUZ PA

7300 N Kendall Drive Suite 542

Miami, FL 33156

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

05/18/2022 : CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

05/18/2022 : COMPLAINT

REQUEST SUMMONS

05/18/2022 : REQUEST SUMMONS

NOTICE OF SERVICE

05/18/2022 : NOTICE OF SERVICE

PRE-TRIAL REMOTE SUMMONS ISSUED

05/19/2022 : PRE-TRIAL REMOTE SUMMONS ISSUED

AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION OF SERVICE

05/24/2022 : AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION OF SERVICE

MOTION TO DISMISS / DISSOLVE

06/14/2022 : MOTION TO DISMISS / DISSOLVE

NOTICE OF/FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

06/16/2022 : NOTICE OF/FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/13/2022
  • DocketSession Type: Case Management Conference; Court Officer: Wesley Heidt; Location: CI-7, City Island Courthouse; Status: Cancelled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketSession Type: Pre-Trial; Court Officer: Wesley Heidt; Location: WHZM, Zoom Meetings; Status: Cancelled; Comments: Summons Exec

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Docket Type: NOTICE OF/FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Description: w/o prej by Space Coast Corporate Health Services PA etc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Docket Type: MOTION TO DISMISS / DISSOLVE; Description: by Sedgwick Claims Management Services Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Docket Type: AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION OF SERVICE; Description: exec Sedgwick Claims Management Services Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 80.00; Final Amount: 80.00; Credits: -80.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 10.00; Final Amount: 10.00; Credits: -10.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Docket Type: PRE-TRIAL REMOTE SUMMONS ISSUED; Description: To SEDGWICK CLAIMS MANAGEMENT SERVICES INC fwd to pltfs Atty via e-service for SOP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Docket Type: NOTICE OF SERVICE; Description: of CMO by Space Coast

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: to Sedgwick Claims Management Services Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Docket Type: COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Docket Type: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CLOW CHIROPRACTIC OFFICE is a litigant

Latest cases where SPACE COAST CORPORATE HEALTH SERVICES PA is a litigant

Latest cases where SEDGWICK CLAIMS MANAGEMENT SERVICES INC. THIRD-PARTY ADMINISTRATOR INSURED BY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Blanca D Cruz