This case was last updated from Volusia County Courts on 08/09/2022 at 18:07:20 (UTC).

SOUTHEAST ASSOCIATION OF HEALTHCARE PROVIDERS INC D B A RETURN TO HEALTH MEDICAL HOME AND WELLNESS V. STANDARD FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 06/16/2022 SOUTHEAST ASSOCIATION OF HEALTHCARE PROVIDERS INC D B A RETURN TO HEALTH MEDICAL HOME AND WELLNESS filed an Other lawsuit against STANDARD FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Volusia County Courts, Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Wesley Heidt. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********COCI

  • Filing Date:

    06/16/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Wesley Heidt

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SOUTHEAST ASSOCIATION OF HEALTHCARE PROVIDERS INC D B A RETURN TO HEALTH MEDICAL HOME AND WELLNESS

RETURN TO HEALTH MEDICAL HOME AND WELLNESS CENTER

SARAH JANE JABERINA

GED LAWYERS LLP

Boca Raton, FL 33487

Defendant

STANDARD FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY

Tallahassee, FL 32314-6200

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHAD CHRISTENSEN

Attorney at GED LAWYERS LLP

7171 N Federal Highway

Boca Raton, FL 33487

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

06/16/2022 : COMPLAINT

REQUEST SUMMONS

06/16/2022 : REQUEST SUMMONS

PRE-TRIAL REMOTE SUMMONS ISSUED

06/20/2022 : PRE-TRIAL REMOTE SUMMONS ISSUED

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

07/05/2022 : NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/16/2023
  • DocketSession Type: Case Management Conference; Court Officer: Wesley Heidt; Location: CI-7, City Island Courthouse; Status: Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketSession Type: Pre-Trial; Court Officer: Wesley Heidt; Location: WHZM, Zoom Meetings; Status: Cancelled; Comments: Summons Exec

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4); Docket Type: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS; Description: CFO obo The Standard Fire Ins Co

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 55.00; Final Amount: 55.00; Credits: -55.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 10.00; Final Amount: 10.00; Credits: -10.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3); Docket Type: PRE-TRIAL REMOTE SUMMONS ISSUED; Description: To THE STANDARD FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY forwarded to plaintiff's attorney via e-service for SOP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2); Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: to The Standard Fire Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1); Docket Type: COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RETURN TO HEALTH MEDICAL HOME is a litigant

Latest cases where GED LAWYERS LLP is a litigant

Latest cases where Standard Fire Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHRISTENSEN , CHAD