Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Volusia County Courts on 03/12/2020 at 17:09:58 (UTC).

SIMEON RAFAEL GARCI RAPPOSELLI V. SARA JAHAN ESLAMI

Case Summary

On 04/26/2019 SIMEON RAFAEL GARCI RAPPOSELLI filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against SARA JAHAN ESLAMI. This case was filed in Volusia County Courts, Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Steven C. Henderson. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********FMCI

  • Filing Date:

    04/26/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Volusia County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Steven C. Henderson

 

Party Details

Petitioner

SIMEON RAFAEL GARCI RAPPOSELLI

Respondent

SARA JAHAN ESLAMI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

ALLISON RUB-RODRIGUEZ

3301 Ponce De Leon Blvd Suite 200

Coral Galbes, FL 33134

Respondent Attorney

TONYA D CROMARTIE

648 S Ridgewood Ave

Daytona Beach, FL 32114

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/26/2020
  • HearingSession Type: Hearing; Court Officer: Steven C. Henderson; Location: CI-9, City Island Courthouse; Status: Cancelled; Comments: Motion to set aside settlement agreement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • HearingSession Type: Case Management Conference; Court Officer: Steven C. Henderson; Location: CI-9, City Island Courthouse; Status: Cancelled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • Docket(#43) Docket Type: FINAL ORDER / JUDGMENT FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE; Description: w/att'd stipulation **0 copies/ 0 envs** Instrument: 2020050099 Book: 7826 Page: 2430

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • Docket(#42) Docket Type: COPY OF ID/DRIVER'S LICENSE; Description: resp

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • Docket(#41) Docket Type: NOTICE OF FILING; Description: FL DL by resp

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • Docket(#40) Docket Type: NOTICE / ORDER OF CANCELING OF HEARING; Description: by resp

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • Docket(#39) Docket Type: STIPULATION; Description: on resp mtn to set aside MSA & parenting plan

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2019
  • Docket(#38) Docket Type: NOTICE OF HEARING; Description: amended

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • Docket(#37) Docket Type: NOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • Docket(#36) Docket Type: ORDER OF CASE MANAGEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
36 More Docket Entries
  • 04/26/2019
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 408.00; Final Amount: 408.00; Credits: -408.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • Docket(#9) Docket Type: COPY OF LETTER; Description: re: case being abated until Family Law Civil Cover Sheet is filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • Docket(#8) Docket Type: CERTIFICATE DIST PARENTING NOTICE/STANDING ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • Docket(#7) Docket Type: NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY; Description: by atty Allison Rub-Rodriguez

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • Docket(#6) Docket Type: ANSWER AND WAIVER; Description: resp

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • Docket(#5) Docket Type: NOTICE OF FILING SOCIAL SEC NUMBER; Description: pet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • Docket(#4) Docket Type: AGREEMENT MARITAL SETTLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • Docket(#3) Docket Type: NOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • Docket(#2) Docket Type: AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION OF CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • Docket(#1) Docket Type: PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less