This case was last updated from Volusia County Circuit Courts on 01/03/2023 at 14:02:47 (UTC).

SHERI CRAIG V. ASHLEY HARTMANN, ET AL

Case Summary

On 12/01/2022 SHERI CRAIG filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against ASHLEY HARTMANN,. This case was filed in Volusia County Circuit Courts, Volusia County Courthouse Deland located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Angela A. Dempsey. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********CODL

  • Filing Date:

    12/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Angela A. Dempsey

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SHERI CRAIG

Deltona, FL 32738

Defendants

ASHLEY HARTMANN

Deltona, FL 32738

KEVIN HARTMANN

Deltona, FL 32738

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF/FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

12/27/2022 : NOTICE OF/FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

NOTICE OF/FOR MEDIATION/ARBITRATION

12/21/2022 : NOTICE OF/FOR MEDIATION/ARBITRATION

ORDER OF/FOR TRIAL

12/21/2022 : ORDER OF/FOR TRIAL

RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED

12/09/2022 : RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED

RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED

12/09/2022 : RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED

MEMORANDUM BY JUDGE

12/09/2022 : MEMORANDUM BY JUDGE

DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS

12/07/2022 : DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS

ANSWER BY/FOR DEFENDANT

12/07/2022 : ANSWER BY/FOR DEFENDANT

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

12/01/2022 : CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

12/01/2022 : CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

FIVE DAY SUMMONS

12/01/2022 : FIVE DAY SUMMONS

FIVE DAY SUMMONS

12/01/2022 : FIVE DAY SUMMONS

REQUEST SUMMONS

12/01/2022 : REQUEST SUMMONS

DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS

12/01/2022 : DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS

AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE / VENUE

12/01/2022 : AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE / VENUE

COMPLAINT FOR RESIDENTIAL EVICTION

12/01/2022 : COMPLAINT FOR RESIDENTIAL EVICTION

CIVIL COVER SHEET

12/01/2022 : CIVIL COVER SHEET

INFORMATION SHEET

12/01/2022 : INFORMATION SHEET

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketSession Type: Non-Jury Trial; Court Officer: Angela A. Dempsey; Location: D-312, DeLand; Status: Cancelled

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18); Docket Type: NOTICE OF/FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Description: by Sheri Craig Instrument: 2022286007 Book: 8351 Page: 2366 View: 2022286007

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17); Docket Type: NOTICE OF/FOR MEDIATION/ARBITRATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16); Docket Type: ORDER OF/FOR TRIAL; Description: Non Jury and Mediation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15); Docket Type: RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED; Description: Kevin Hartman

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14); Docket Type: RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED; Description: Ashley Hartman

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13); Docket Type: MEMORANDUM BY JUDGE; Description: Court has reviewed Dfnts Answer; Matter will be scheduled for NJ Trial and Mediation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12); Docket Type: DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS; Description: by Ashley Hartmann

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11); Docket Type: ANSWER BY/FOR DEFENDANT; Description: Ashley Hartmann & Kevin Hartmann

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 185.00; Final Amount: 185.00; Credits: -185.00; Balance: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10); Docket Type: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING; Description: summons and complaint to Kevin Hartmann

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9); Docket Type: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING; Description: summons and complaint to Ashley Hartmann

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8); Docket Type: FIVE DAY SUMMONS; Description: to KEVIN HARTMANN fwd to VSO w/ck #4010 $80.00 for SOP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7); Docket Type: FIVE DAY SUMMONS; Description: to ASHLEY HARTMANN fwd to VSO w/ck #4010 $80.00 for SOP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6); Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: to Ashley Hartmann et al

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5); Docket Type: DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS; Description: by Sheri Craig

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4); Docket Type: AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE / VENUE; Description: as to Ashley Hartmann et al

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3); Docket Type: COMPLAINT FOR RESIDENTIAL EVICTION; Description: unlawful detainer

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2); Docket Type: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1); Docket Type: INFORMATION SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less